EP1776639 - DISK MIRROR ARCHITECTURE FOR DATABASE APPLIANCE WITH LOCALLY BALANCED REGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Netezza Corporation 200 Crossing Boulevard Framingham, MA 01702-4480 / US | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANE, Barry, M. 605 Westbourne Street La Jolla, California 92037 / US | 02 /
HINSHAW, Foster, D. 22 Campbell Park Somerville, MA 02144 / US | 03 /
MACDONALD, Philip, J. 60 Hillcrest Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 04 /
METZGER, John, K. 2 Hundreds Road Westborough, MA 01581 / US | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/17] | 01 /
ZANE, Barry, M. 4 Cobblestone Circle Wayland, MA 01778 / US | ||
02 /
HINSHAW, Foster, D. 22 Campbell Park Somerville, MA 02144 / US | |||
03 /
MACDONALD, Philip, J. 60 Hillcrest Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | |||
04 /
METZGER, John, K. 2 Hundreds Road Westborough, MA 01581 / US | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04794394.9 | 06.10.2004 | [2007/17] | WO2004US33021 | Priority number, date | US20040885519 | 06.07.2004 Original published format: US 885519 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006014180 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1776639 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1776639 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G06F11/2082 (EP,US);
G06F11/2058 (EP,US);
G06F11/2069 (EP,US);
G06F11/2071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESPIEGELTE SPEICHERPLATTENARCHITEKTUR FÜR EIN DATENBANKGERÄT MIT LOKAL BALANCIERTER REGENERATION | [2007/17] | English: | DISK MIRROR ARCHITECTURE FOR DATABASE APPLIANCE WITH LOCALLY BALANCED REGENERATION | [2007/17] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE MIROIR DE DISQUE POUR APPLICATION DE BASE DE DONNEES A REGENERATION LOCALEMENT EQUILIBREE | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 29.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2007 | BE | 12.12.2007 | CH | 12.12.2007 | CY | 12.12.2007 | CZ | 12.12.2007 | DK | 12.12.2007 | EE | 12.12.2007 | FI | 12.12.2007 | LI | 12.12.2007 | NL | 12.12.2007 | PL | 12.12.2007 | RO | 12.12.2007 | SI | 12.12.2007 | SK | 12.12.2007 | TR | 12.12.2007 | BG | 12.03.2008 | SE | 12.03.2008 | DE | 13.03.2008 | GR | 13.03.2008 | ES | 23.03.2008 | PT | 12.05.2008 | HU | 13.06.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/36] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
DE | 13.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
HU | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
DE | 13.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
DE | 13.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
DE | 13.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
DE | 13.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
DE | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0541992 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 11 * * column 4, line 25 - column 6, line 28 * * column 12, line 39 - column 15, line 33 *; | [A]EP0784273 (SYMBIOS LOGIC INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 36 - column 2, line 58 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 16 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 54 ** figure 1 *; | [A]US2003237019 (KLEIMAN STEVEN R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0037] , [0043] , [0047] , [0049] - [0052] - [0070] - [0079] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004128442 (HINSHAW FOSTER D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0011] , [0013] , [0041] , [0057] - [0059] - [0062] - [0064] - [0097] , [0100] , [0106] * |