EP1692043 - CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastipak Packaging Inc. 41605 Ann Arbor Road Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2012/25] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states PLASTIPAK PACKAGING, INC. 41605 Ann Arbor Road Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARR, Richard, C. 1183 Ty Drive Medina, OH 44256 / US | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [2008/45] | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Weiss, Peter Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04794450.9 | 07.10.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004US33104 | Priority number, date | US20030734350 | 12.12.2003 Original published format: US 734350 | US20030746706 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: US 746706 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061337 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692043 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692043 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02, B65D1/42 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
B65D1/42 (EP);
B65D1/0223 (EP);
B65D1/023 (EP);
B65D2203/02 (EP);
B65D2501/0036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER | [2006/34] | English: | CONTAINER | [2006/34] | French: | RECIPIENT | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12172497.5 / EP2517968 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2004 | AT | 20.06.2012 | CY | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | PL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | IE | 07.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IE | 07.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IE | 07.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IE | 07.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0112511 (PECHINEY EMBALLAGE FLEXIBLE EU [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,8,10-18 * page 11, line 1 - line 2; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO0140081 (GRAHAM PACKAGING CO [US], et al) [A] 9,19,20 * page 4, line 3 - line 12; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2002092821 (SAITO HIROMICHI [JP], et al) [A] 4-6* figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US6296131 (RASHID A B M BAZLUR [US]); | [Y]US3225950 (JOSEPHSEN ROY C, et al); | [Y]US5988417 (CHENG JIZU J [US], et al); | [Y]US6065624 (STEINKE JAMES R [US]); | [Y]US3309836 (HALLOWELL JR FULTON W); | [Y]US5224616 (CRISCI HARRY E [US]); | [Y]US4591060 (TSUKADA TAKAMI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5529196 (LANE MICHAEL T [US]); | [A]US3403804 (ROBERTO COLOMBO) | by applicant | WO0112511 | US3225950 |