EP1673039 - STENT GRAFT FENESTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states William A. Cook Australia Pty. Ltd. 12 Electronics Street, Brisbane Technology Park Eight Mile Plains, Brisbane Queensland 4113 / AU | For all designated states William Cook Europe ApS Sandet 6 4632 Bjaeverskov / DK | For all designated states Cook Incorporated 750 N.Daniels Way P.O. BOX 489 Bloomington, Indiana 47402-0489 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states William A. Cook Australia Pty. Ltd. 12 Electronics Street, Brisbane Technology Park Eight Mile Plains, Brisbane Queensland 4113 / AU | ||
For all designated states WILLIAM COOK EUROPE ApS Sandet 6 4632 Bjaeverskov / DK | |||
For all designated states Cook Incorporated 750 N.Daniels Way P.O. BOX 489 Bloomington, Indiana 47402-0489 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harley, David Ernest 2 View Street, Subiaco Western Australia 6008 / AU | 02 /
Christiansen, Frank Karhu Allegade 28 DK-4690 Haslev / DK | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Dunne, Emma Louise, et al Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | Dunne, Emma Louise, et al Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct GB-London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04794821.1 | 12.10.2004 | [2006/26] | WO2004US33569 | Priority number, date | US20030510593P | 10.10.2003 Original published format: US 510593 P | US20040549307P | 02.03.2004 Original published format: US 549307 P | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005034809 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1673039 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1673039 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/89 (EP,US);
A61F2002/061 (EP,US);
A61F2002/067 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
A61F2002/821 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0091 (EP,US);
A61F2230/005 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STENT-FENSTER | [2006/26] | English: | STENT GRAFT FENESTRATION | [2006/26] | French: | FENESTRATION D'ENDOPROTHESE A GREFFER | [2006/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 18.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | PL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5961548 (SHMULEWITZ ASCHER [US]) [A] 1-27 * column 4, line 23 - line 34; figure 3B *; | [A]WO0230329 (REX MEDICAL LP [US]) [A] 1-27* the whole document *; | [A]US2002156517 (PEROUSE ERIC PAUL [FR]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03082153 (COOK INC [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * page 14, paragraph 5 - page 16, paragraph 5; figures 7-12 * |