EP1676096 - X-Y AXIS DUAL-MASS TUNING FORK GYROSCOPE WITH VERTICALLY INTEGRATED ELECTRONICS AND WAFER-SCALE HERMETIC PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InvenSense, Inc. Suite 203 2900 Gordon Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2017/23] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states Invensense Inc. Suite 203, 2900 Gordon Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NASIRI, Steven S. 2900 Gordon Ave. Suite 203 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 02 /
SEEGER, Joseph 507 Durham St Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2017/23] |
Former [2006/37] | 01 /
NASIRI, Steven S. 2900 Gordon Ave., Suite 203 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
02 /
SEEGER, Joseph 507 Durham St Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
Former [2006/27] | 01 /
NASIRI, Steven S. 2900 Gordon Ave., Suite 203 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
02 /
SEEGER, Joseph 3952 Harrison St. 105 Oakland, CA 94611 / US | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells Kent TN1 1EE / GB | ||
Former [2017/23] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | ||
Former [2006/27] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04795573.7 | 12.10.2004 | [2006/27] | WO2004US34431 | Priority number, date | US20030690224 | 20.10.2003 Original published format: US 690224 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005043079 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1676096 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1676096 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/5712, G01C19/5719, // H03H9/02 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
G01C19/5712 (EP,US);
G01C19/5719 (EP,US);
H03H2009/02354 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | G01C19/56 | ||
Former IPC [2006/27] | G01C19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2017/23] |
Former [2007/04] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2006/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | X-Y-ACHSEN-DOPPELMASSEN-STIMMGABEL-KREISEL MIT VERTIKAL INTEGRIERTER ELEKTRONIK UND HERMETISCHER VERKAPSELUNG AUF WAFER-MASSSTAB | [2006/27] | English: | X-Y AXIS DUAL-MASS TUNING FORK GYROSCOPE WITH VERTICALLY INTEGRATED ELECTRONICS AND WAFER-SCALE HERMETIC PACKAGING | [2006/27] | French: | GYROSCOPE À DIAPASON, À AXE X-Y ET DOUBLE MASSE AVEC ÉLECRONIQUE À INTÉGRATION VERTICALE ET CONDITIONNEMENT HERMÉTIQUE GRANDEUR PLAQUETTE | [2017/06] |
Former [2006/27] | GYROSCOPE A DIAPASON, A AXE X-Y ET DOUBLE MASSE AVEC ELECRONIQUE A INTEGRATION VERTICALE ET CONDITIONNEMENT HERMETIQUE GRANDEUR PLAQUETTE | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0971208 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1-73 * page 4, paragraph 24 - page 7, paragraph 50; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6062082 (GUENTHER GERO [DE], et al) [A] 1-73* the whole document *; | [XI]WO0171364 (MICROSENSORS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,12-14 * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 24; figures 4-6 * [I] 4,8,15-20,26-60,70-73; | [XI]US2002189352 (REEDS JOHN WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12-14 * the whole document * [I] 4,8,15-20,26-60,70-73; | [A]US2003029238 (CHALLONER A DORIAN [US]) [A] 1-73 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6189381 (HUANG YONGLI [US], et al); | [A]US6250157 (TOUGE HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]US5895850 (BUESTGENS BURKHARD [DE]); | [A]US5359893 (DUNN WILLIAM C [US]) | by applicant | US2002189352 | WO0171364 |