EP1678151 - DIASTEREOMERIC DYNAMIC KINETIC RESOLUTION PROCESS FOR PREPARING (+)-(2S, 3S)-2-(3-CHLOROPHENYL)-3,5,5-TRIMETHYL-2-MORPHOLINOL, SALTS, AND SOLVATES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARTRIDGE, John, Joseph, GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Reed, Michael Antony GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Reed, Michael Antony GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04795781.6 | 21.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004US34667 | Priority number, date | US20030514694P | 27.10.2003 Original published format: US 514694 P | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005044809 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1678151 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D265/32 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/5375 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | 25.04.2006 | LT | 25.04.2006 | LV | 25.04.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES KINETISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR OPTISCHEN TRENNUNG VON DIASTEREOMEREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON (+)-(2S, 3S)-2-(3-CHLORPHENYL)-3,5,5-TRIMETHYL-2-MORPHOLINOL UND SALZEN UND SOLVATEN DAVON | [2006/28] | English: | DIASTEREOMERIC DYNAMIC KINETIC RESOLUTION PROCESS FOR PREPARING (+)-(2S, 3S)-2-(3-CHLOROPHENYL)-3,5,5-TRIMETHYL-2-MORPHOLINOL, SALTS, AND SOLVATES THEREOF | [2006/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE RESOLUTION CINETIQUE DYNAMIQUE DIASTEREOMERE PERMETTANT DE PREPARER DU (+)-(2S, 3S)-2-(3-CHLOROPHENYL)-3,5,5-TRIMETHYL-2-MORPHOLINOL, LEURS SELS ET LEURS SOLVATES | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 12.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/48] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0162257 (SEPRACOR INC [US]) [A] 1-36 * Scheme 4;; example 2 *; | [A]US6323368 (EVANS GRAHAM [GB]) [A] 1-36 * example 1 *; | [A] - WARD R S, "Dynamic Kinetic Resolution", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199507), vol. 6, no. 7, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 1475 - 1490, XP004048110 [A] 1-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0957-4166(95)00179-S |