EP1680611 - BOLTED PILOT WEB WITH PRECISION MACHINED BEARING STOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA CORPORATION 4500 Dorr Street Toledo, OH 43615 / US | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENSTRUP, Leo 3668 Arbutus Trail Portage, MI 49024 / US | 02 /
TURNER, Gary 215E. Hoffman Street Three Rivers, MI 49093 / US | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Golkowsky, Stefan, et al Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M. HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04796218.8 | 22.10.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004US35184 | Priority number, date | US20030698266 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: US 698266 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005045283 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1680611 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1680611 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/02, F16H48/06 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
F16H48/08 (EP,US);
F16H2048/426 (EP,US);
F16H48/40 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2186 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2188 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHRAUBTER FÜHRUNGSSTEG MIT PRÄZISIONSBEARBEITETEM LAGERANSCHLAG | [2006/29] | English: | BOLTED PILOT WEB WITH PRECISION MACHINED BEARING STOP | [2006/29] | French: | FLASQUE DE CENTRAGE BOULONNÉ AVEC ARRÊT DE ROULEMENT USINÉ AVEC PRÉCISION | [2007/48] |
Former [2006/29] | FLASQUE CHAMBREE A ARRET DE ROULEMENT USINE AVEC PRECISION | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2008 | BE | 14.05.2008 | CY | 14.05.2008 | CZ | 14.05.2008 | DK | 14.05.2008 | EE | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | PL | 14.05.2008 | RO | 14.05.2008 | SI | 14.05.2008 | SK | 14.05.2008 | BG | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | IE | 22.10.2008 | LU | 22.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/36] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CY | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 22.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 22.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 14.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2609710 (OSBORN PAUL V) [A] 1 * figures 2-4 *; | [DA]US4004472 (MILLWARD THOMAS HUGHES, et al) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2003083171 (TURNER GARY A [US], et al) [A] 1-4,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2832481 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,5-8 * page 7, lines 9-19 - page 8, lines 13-16; figures 3-5 * |