EP1691848 - TOOLS AND TOOL KITS FOR PERFORMING MINIMALLY INVASIVE PROCEDURES ON THE SPINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRANS1, Inc. 1800 Sir Tyler Drive, Suite 101 Wilmington, North Carolina 28405 / US | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASSELL, Robert, L. 6001 Wellesley Place Wilmington, NC 28409 / US | 02 /
AINSWORTH, Stephen, D. 5309 Curlew Drive Wilmington, NC 28409 / US | 03 /
CRAGG, Andrew, L. 5024 Bruce Place Edina, MN 55424 / US | 04 /
DICKHUDT, Eugene, A. 801 Continental Drive St. Paul, MN 55112 / US | [2011/08] |
Former [2006/34] | 01 /
ASSELL, Robert, L. 6001 Wellesley Place Wilmington, NC 28409 / US | ||
02 /
AINSWORTH, Steven, D. 5309 Curlew Drive Wilmington, NC 28409 / US | |||
03 /
CRAGG, Andrew, L. 5024 Bruce Place Edina, MN 55424 / US | |||
04 /
DICKHUDT, Eugene, A. 801 Continental Drive St. Paul, MN 55112 / US | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander, et al Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Straus, Alexander, et al Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/24] | Gröschel, Ralf, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Phoenixbau Königstraße 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04796283.2 | 22.10.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004US35269 | Priority number, date | US20030513899P | 23.10.2003 Original published format: US 513899 P | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005039651 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1691848 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1691848 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/46, A61B17/16 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/025 (EP,US);
A61B17/88 (KR);
A61B17/7074 (US);
A61B17/1604 (EP,US);
A61B17/1671 (EP,US);
A61B17/1697 (EP,US);
A61B17/1757 (EP,US);
A61B17/22 (KR);
A61B17/8615 (EP,US);
A61B17/888 (EP,US);
A61B17/8888 (EP,US);
A61B17/92 (KR);
A61B17/0218 (EP,US);
A61B17/1615 (EP,US);
A61B17/8897 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00261 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00469 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0256 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22038 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22044 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | A61F5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/34] | A61L2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGE UND WERKZEUGSETS ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON MINIMALINVASIVEN VERFAHREN AN DER WIRBELSÄULE | [2006/34] | English: | TOOLS AND TOOL KITS FOR PERFORMING MINIMALLY INVASIVE PROCEDURES ON THE SPINE | [2006/34] | French: | INSTRUMENTS ET KITS D'INSTRUMENTS POUR EFFECTUER DES MICROMANIPULATIONS CHIRURGICALES SUR LA COLONNE VERTEBRALE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10177627.6 / EP2305155 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2004 | BE | 22.08.2012 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | IT | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | IE | 22.10.2012 | LU | 22.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | ES | 03.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
LU | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | BE | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | BE | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | BE | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 22.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9611639 (RAYMEDICA INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 6 - page 9, line 24; figures 2,4 *; | [X]WO9849945 (SURGICAL DYNAMICS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9 * page 8, line 4 - line 30; figures 1,3,4 * * page 10, line 12 - line 16; figure 16 * * page 12, line 15; figure 34 *; | [X]WO9951149 (KYPHON INC [US]) [X] 1,6,7,9 * page 12, line 30 - page 14, line 29; figures 12,13 ** page 15, line 18 - page 17, line 18; figure 21 *; | [X]US2002183758 (MIDDLETON LANCE M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0049]; figures 2-5,7,10,13 * | International search | [X]US6371968 (KOGASAKA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US6558390 (CRAGG ANDREW H [US]); | [A]US2003130664 (BOUCHER RYAN P [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9611639 | WO9849945 | WO9951149 | US2002183758 | US6558386 | US6558390 | US6575979 | US20000710369 | US20010782534 | US20020125771 | US20020309416 | US20040853476 |