EP1682152 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF NERVOUS SYSTEM DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNS Response 2755 Bristol Street Suite 285 Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | [2009/09] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states CNS Response 2510 North Grand Avenue, Suite 206 Santa Anna, CA 92705 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUFFIN, Stephen, C. 13151 Chandler Boulevard Sherman Oaks, CA 91401 / US | 02 /
EMORY, W., Hamin 21609 Rambla Vista Malibu, CA 90265 / US | 03 /
BRANDT, Leonard 28911 Via Hacienda San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/30] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04796486.1 | 27.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004US35559 | Priority number, date | US20030697497 | 30.10.2003 Original published format: US 697497 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005044190 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1682152 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/55, A61K31/137, A61P25/00 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/045 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2006/30] | A61K31/55, A61K31/135 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | 16.05.2006 | HR | 16.05.2006 | LT | 16.05.2006 | LV | 16.05.2006 | MK | 16.05.2006 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN DES NERVENSYSTEMS | [2006/30] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF NERVOUS SYSTEM DISORDERS | [2006/30] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LES TROUBLES DU SYSTEME NERVEUX | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/29] | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MUSSO D L ET AL, "Synthesis and evaluation of the anticonvulsant activity of a series of 2-amino-1-phenyl-1-propanols derived from the metabolites of the antidepressant bupropion", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (19970107), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1 - 6, XP004135955 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(96)00577-X | International search | [Y]US6337328 (FANG QUN KEVIN [US], et al); | [X]US2002147196 (QUESSY STEVEN NOEL [US], et al); | [Y] - HOSAK L. AND LIBIGER J., "Antipileptic drug in schizophrenia: a review", EUROPEAN PSYCHIATRY, (200211), vol. 17, no. 7, page 371, XP002316065 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-9338(02)00696-X | by applicant | US6337328 | - HOSAK L.; LIBIGER J., "Antiepileptic drugs in schizophrenia: a review", EUROPEAN PSYCHIATRY, (2002), vol. 17, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/S0924-9338(02)00696-X, pages 371 - 378, XP002316065 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-9338(02)00696-X |