EP1685544 - MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALTESEK, Anthony, E. 262 N. McCarrons Blvd. Roseville, MN 55113 / US | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Chamberlain, Alan James, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Chamberlain, Alan James, et al Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2006/31] | Vigars, Christopher Ian HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay, 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04796491.1 | 27.10.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004US35570 | Priority number, date | US20030714709 | 17.11.2003 Original published format: US 714709 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005050584 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1685544 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08B29/12, G08B25/14 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
G08B25/14 (EP,US);
G08B29/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/31] | G08B29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2006/31] | English: | MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2006/31] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.04.2011 | 12.04.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/42] | 06.06.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5400246 (WILSON DENNIS A [US], et al) [X] 1-25* the whole document *; | [X]US6229429 (HORON DANIEL J [US]) [X] 1-25 * figure 5 * * column 7, line 14 - column 8, line 11 *; | [X]WO0169564 (PITTWAY CORP [US]) [X] 1-25 * page 42, line 26 - page 4.3, line 7 *; | [X]WO0201531 (GLOBALA TRYGGHETSBOLAGET AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-25 * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 20 *; | [X]US2002097150 (SANDELMAN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0044] *; | [X]US6535110 (ARORA ANISH K [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * column 9, lines 24-56 *; | [X]US2003058096 (SHTEYN EUGENE [US]) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0019] * | International search | [X]US5400246 (WILSON DENNIS A [US], et al) | by applicant | US2002097150 |