EP1692836 - MULTI-CARRIER TRANSMITTER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/34] | MULTI-CARRIER TRANSCEIVER ASSEMBLY | ||
[2016/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | [2011/14] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles CA 90067-2199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, Ian 1079 Marco Place Venice, CA 90291 / US | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04796738.5 | 28.10.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004US35983 | Priority number, date | US20030700310 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: US 700310 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005046155 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692836 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692836 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/04, H04B7/04, H04L5/06 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
H04L5/06 (EP,US);
H04B1/0483 (EP,US);
H04B7/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2017/14] |
Former [2007/06] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrträgersender | [2016/46] | English: | MULTI-CARRIER TRANSMITTER ASSEMBLY | [2016/46] | French: | Émetteur multiporteur | [2016/46] |
Former [2006/34] | MEHRTRÄGER-SENDER-/-EMPFÄNGERBAUGRUPPE | ||
Former [2006/34] | MULTI-CARRIER TRANSCEIVER ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [2006/34] | ENSEMBLE D'EMETTEURS-RECEPTEURS MULTIPORTEUSES | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0831627 (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 1,12-16,28-30,34,38-40 * abstract * * figure 3 * * column 3, line 34 - line 49 * * column 4, line 37 - line 58 * [A] 2-11,17-27,31-33,35-37,41-48; | [YA]US5914933 (CIMINI LEONARD JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1,12-16,28-30,34,38-40 * abstract * * figures 1A,2 * * claims 1-13 * * column 2, line 63 - line 67 * * column 3, lines 1-67 * * column 4, lines 1-56 * [A] 2-11,17-27,31-33,35-37,41-48; | [YA]EP0929161 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 1,12-16,28-30,34,38-40 * abstract * * figures 4-11 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0049] * * claims 1-3,6-8 *[A] 2-11,17-27,31-33,35-37,41-48; | [YA]US6131016 (GREENSTEIN LAWRENCE JOEL [US], et al) [Y] 1,12-16,28-30,34,38-40 * abstract * * figure 2A * * column 3, line 33 - line 67 * * claim 1 * [A] 2-11,17-27,31-33,35-37,41-48; | [YA]US6331837 (SHATTIL STEVE J [US]) [Y] 1,12-16,28-30,34,38-40 * abstract * * figures 11A,11B,11C,12 * * column 13, line 37 - line 67 * * column 14, line 26 - line 42 * [A] 2-11,17-27,31-33,35-37,41-48; | [YA]US2002176510 (LAROIA RAJIV [US]) [Y] 1,12-16,28-30,34,38-40 * abstract * * figures 1,3A,3B * * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0007] , [0012] , [0039] , [0040] , [0042] , [0043] , [0055] - [0059] * [A] 2-11,17-27,31-33,35-37,41-48; | [YA] - CIMINI L J ET AL, "OFDM WITH DIVERSITY AND CODING FOR HIGH-BIT-RATE MOBILE DATA APPLICATIONS", INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MOBILE MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATIONS, XX, XX, (1997), pages 247 - 254, XP000856378 [Y] 1,12-16,28-30,34,38-40 [A] 2-11,17-27,31-33,35-37,41-48 |