EP1700153 - EYEGLASS MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPHTHONIX, INC. 10455 Pacific Center Court San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREHER, Andreas, W. 3105 Paseo Cristal Escondido, CA 92029 / US | 02 /
JETHMALANI, Jagdish 11018 West Ocean Air Drive 368 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
WARDEN, Laurence 12913 Camino Del Valle Poway, CA 92064 / US | 04 /
LAI, Shui, T. 1224 Orchard Glen Circle Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/37] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 04796811.0 | 29.10.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004US36099 | Priority number, date | US20030520065P | 14.11.2003 Original published format: US 520065 P | US20040546378P | 20.02.2004 Original published format: US 546378 P | US20040936131 | 07.09.2004 Original published format: US 936131 | US20040936132 | 07.09.2004 Original published format: US 936132 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005050289 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1700153 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02, G02B3/00, G02B27/00 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
G02C7/02 (EP);
A61B3/10 (KR);
B24B13/00 (EP);
B29D11/00355 (EP);
B29D11/00413 (EP);
B29D11/00442 (EP);
B29D11/00528 (EP);
G02C13/003 (EP);
G02C13/005 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BRILLEN | [2006/37] | English: | EYEGLASS MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2006/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LUNETTES | [2006/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 25.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2012 | 18.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/06] | 28.09.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/06] | 09.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0102896 (E VISION LLC [US]) [X] 1,33,36,37,40-43 * page 18, line 13 - page 19, line 14 * * page 23, line 16 - page 24, line 24; figures 1-28 *[Y] 46-55; | [Y]US6450642 (JETHMALANI JAGDISH M [US], et al) [Y] 16-18,38,39,44,46-55 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 25 * * column 8, line 44 - line 63 * * column 15, line 62 - column 16, line 26; figure 5 *; | [XY]US2003081172 (DREHER ANDREAS W [US]) [X] 1,6-15,20-24,28-33,36,37,41-43,55-58 * page 1, paragraph 6 - paragraph 12 * * page 2, paragraph 28 - page 3, paragraph 36; figures 1,2,12 * [Y] 2-5,16-18,25-27,34,35,38,39,44,60,61; | [Y]US2003081173 (DREHER ANDREAS W [US]) [Y] 2-5,25-27,34,35,60,61 * page 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraph 30; figure 9 *; | [PXY]WO2004034095 (OPHTHONIX INC [US]) [PX] 1-18,20-45,56-66 * page 3, paragraph 27 - page 14, paragraph 74; figures 1,2,7,8,10-16,18 * * abstract * [PY] 46-55; | [PXY]US2004160574 (DREHER ANDREAS W [US]) [PX] 1,6-15,24,28-33,55-58 * page 1, paragraph 8 - paragraph 13 * * page 2, paragraph 31 - page 3, paragraph 39; figures 1,2,12 * [PY] 2-5,16-18,25-27,34,35,38,39,44,60,61 | Examination | US2003143391 | US2004263786 |