EP1686909 - A MODULAR CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cathrx Ltd Unit 8 2 South Street Rydalmere, NSW 2117 / AU | [2018/28] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Cathrx Ltd 5 Parkview Drive Homebush Bay, NSW 2127 / AU | ||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states CATHRX LTD Room G11 National Innovation Centre Australian Technology Park Everleigh, NSW 1430 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Neil 95 Macquarie Street Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | 02 /
CHONG, Evan 95 Macquarie Street Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | 03 /
PARTLETT, Matthew Unit 1 69-71 Noble Street Allawah, NSW 2218 / AU | [2018/31] |
Former [2006/32] | 01 /
ANDERSON, Neil 95 Macquarie Street Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | ||
02 /
CHONG, Evan 95 Macquarie Street Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | |||
03 /
PARTLETT, Matthew Unit 1 69-71 Noble Street Allawah, NSW 2218 / AU | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Steinerstrasse 15/A 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Straße 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/32] | Nettleton, John Victor, et al Abel & Imray, Chartered Patent Attorneys, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1V 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04797086.8 | 24.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004AU01638 | Priority number, date | US20030525450P | 25.11.2003 Original published format: US 525450 P | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005051216 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1686909 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1686909 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18, A61B18/14, A61M25/01 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
A61M25/0105 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B5/287 (EP,US);
A61M25/01 (EP,US);
A61M25/0102 (EP,US);
A61M25/0136 (EP,US);
A61M25/0147 (EP,US);
A61B2017/003 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00178 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/32] | A61B18/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/31] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MODULARER KATHETER | [2006/32] | English: | A MODULAR CATHETER | [2006/32] | French: | CATHETER MODULAIRE | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13153622.9 / EP2599458 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2004 | AT | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | NL | 01.08.2018 | PL | 01.08.2018 | PT | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | IE | 24.11.2018 | LU | 24.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 24.11.2004 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 24.11.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 24.11.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 24.11.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 24.11.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 24.11.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 24.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
IS | 01.12.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SE156901 (GIDLUND AS) [A] 1-12* figures 1-6 *; | [A]US3416531 (LOWELL EDWARDS MILES) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 65; figures 1-7; claim 18 *; | [Y]US3552384 (PIERIE WILL R, et al) [Y] 8,12 * line 74 - column 8, line 5; claim 1 * * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - line 65 * * column 2, line 55 - line 57; figures 1-2 * * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 20; figures 9,12,11,13,14 *; | [XYI]US5487757 (TRUCKAI CSABA [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10,11 * Title; column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 25; figure 1 * * figures 2c,5a,4b * [Y] 8,12 [I] 9; | [A]US5860953 (SNOKE PHILLIP JACK [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 32; figures 3-7 * | International search | [A]US6221070 (TU HOSHENG [US], et al) | Examination | EP0647435 | US5830146 | US5861024 | US2002198583 |