EP1687671 - POLARIZATION-INDEPENDENT ELECTRO-OPTIC MODULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA Rue Jaquet-Droz 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA Rue Jaquet-Droz 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUBLER, Ulrich Abendweg 4 CH-6006 Luzern / CH | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich) Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 2792 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2007/36] | Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 2792 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/32] | Brulliard, Joel c/o CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA, Rue Jaquet-Droz 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 04797242.7 | 12.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004CH00685 | Priority number, date | EP20030405840 | 25.11.2003 Original published format: EP 03405840 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052680 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1687671 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/21, G02F1/061 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
G02F1/21 (EP);
G02F1/061 (EP);
G02F2202/20 (EP);
G02F2203/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLARISATIONSUNABHÄNGIGER ELEKTROOPTISCHER MODULATOR | [2006/32] | English: | POLARIZATION-INDEPENDENT ELECTRO-OPTIC MODULATOR | [2006/32] | French: | MODULATEUR ELECTRO-OPTIQUE INDEPENDANT DE LA POLARISATION | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 15.08.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 13.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4198115 (KAMINOW IVAN P) [A] 4 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 52; figures 1-6 *; | [A] - WANG C W ET AL, "DESIGN AND MODELING OF ASYMMETRIC FABRY-PEROT ELECTROOPTIC MODULATORS CONTAINING A POLYMERIC FILM", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19940301), vol. 30, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9197, pages 724 - 731, XP000450557 [A] 1,10 * chapter III, section A, pages 726 - 727 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3.286161 | [A] - ELDERING C A ET AL, "ELECTRICALLY INDUCED TRANSMISSIVITY MODULATION IN POLYMERIC THIN FILM FABRY-PEROT ETALONS", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA,WASHINGTON, US, (19891015), vol. 28, no. 20, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 4442 - 4445, XP000071291 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.28.004442 |