EP1689896 - METHOD OF COOLING MOLTEN METAL DURING FRACTIONAL CRYSTALLISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aleris Switzerland GmbH Pestalozzistrasse 2 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2007/27] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Corus Technology BV P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE VRIES, Paul, Alexander Frans Lehárlaan 133 NL-2102 GM Heemstede / NL | 02 /
WOUTERS, Huibrecht, Adriaan Beekforel 26 NL-2318 MB Leiden / NL | 03 /
RUTTEN, Martinus, Leonardus Westerschouwenhof 11 NL-6845 CA Arnhem / NL | 04 /
AURICH, Volker, Gerhard Van Wassenaerweg 7 NL-6862 ZC Oosterbeek / NL | 05 /
TEN HAVE, Johannes, Hendrikus Waterwolf 16 NL-6681 TJ Bemmel / NL | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frank Peter, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Müller, Frank Peter, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/22] | Müller, Frank Peter, et al Müller Schupfner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04797848.1 | 10.11.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004EP12836 | Priority number, date | EP20030078689 | 19.11.2003 Original published format: EP 03078689 | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005049875 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1689896 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1689896 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C22B21/06, C22B9/00 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
C22B21/062 (EP,US);
C22B9/02 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABKÜHLEN VON SCHMELZFLÜSSIGEM METALL BEI DER FRAKTIONIERTEN KRISTALLISATION | [2006/33] | English: | METHOD OF COOLING MOLTEN METAL DURING FRACTIONAL CRYSTALLISATION | [2006/33] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A REFROIDIR DU METAL EN FUSION PENDANT LA CRISTALLISATION FRACTIONNAIRE | [2006/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 08.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.03.2008 | CY | 12.03.2008 | CZ | 12.03.2008 | DK | 12.03.2008 | EE | 12.03.2008 | FI | 12.03.2008 | IT | 12.03.2008 | NL | 12.03.2008 | PL | 12.03.2008 | RO | 12.03.2008 | SI | 12.03.2008 | SK | 12.03.2008 | TR | 12.03.2008 | BG | 12.06.2008 | GR | 13.06.2008 | IS | 12.07.2008 | PT | 18.08.2008 | HU | 13.09.2008 | GB | 10.11.2008 | IE | 10.11.2008 | LU | 10.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
TR | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
GB | 10.11.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
LU | 10.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
GB | 10.11.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
LU | 10.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
GB | 10.11.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
LU | 10.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
GB | 10.11.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/52] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | BE | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3211547 (NOEL JARRETT, et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US4273627 (DAWLESS ROBERT K, et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0099948 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0375308 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |