EP1692120 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHIRAL MERCAPTO AMINO ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM Fine Chemicals Austria Nfg GmbH & Co KG St.-Peter-Strasse 25 4021 Linz / AT | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTTHAUS, Martina Hanriederstrasse 22 A-4020 Linz / AT | 02 /
MAYRHOFER, Herbert Freistädterstrasse 62 A-4209 Engerwitzdorf / AT | 03 /
ROGL, Christian Niederschöfring 3 A-4502 St.Marien / AT | 04 /
KRICH, Sylvia Aigen 11 A-4204 Haibach i. Mkr. / AT | 05 /
SIMETZBERGER, Michael Mooslanderweg 8 A-4030 Linz / AT | [2006/39] |
Former [2006/34] | 01 /
KOTTHAUS, Martina Hanriederstrasse 22 A-4020 Linz / AT | ||
02 /
MAYRHOFER, Herbert Freistädterstrasse 62 A-4209 Engerwitzdorf / AT | |||
03 /
ROGL, Christian Niederschöfring 3 A-4502 St.Marien / AT | |||
04 /
KRICH, Sylvia Raiffeisenweg 24/5 A-4203 Altenberger bei Linz / AT | |||
05 /
SIMETZBERGER, Michael Mooslanderweg 8 A-4030 Linz / AT | Representative(s) | Habets, Winand Johannes Antonius, et al DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | Habets, Winand, et al DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [2007/27] | Habets, Winand, et al DSM Intellectual Property DSM IP Assets B.V. Geleen Office P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [2006/34] | Lindinger, Ingrid DSM Fine Chemicals Austria Nfg GmbH & Co KG, St. Peter-Strasse 25 4021 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 04797894.5 | 15.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004EP12919 | Priority number, date | AT20030001968 | 09.12.2003 Original published format: AT 19682003 | [2006/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061469 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692120 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/10, C07D277/06, C07C319/06, C07C323/58, C12P13/12, // C12P13/12, C12R1/23, C12R1/33 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
C07C319/06 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/06, C07C323/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHIRALEN MERCAPTOAMINOS UREN | [2006/34] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHIRAL MERCAPTO AMINO ACIDS | [2006/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MERCAPTO-AMINOACIDES CHIRAUX | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 22.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY] - J. MARTENS, ET AL., "Einfache Synthese von racemischen Cystein", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, WEINHEIM, DE, (1981), vol. 93, no. 8, pages 680 - 683, XP008042720 [DY] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ange.19810930808 | [DA] - G.C. MULQUEEN, ET AL., "Synthesis of the thiazoline-based siderophore (S)-desferrithiocin", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1993), vol. 49, no. 24, pages 5359 - 5364, XP002317627 [DA] 1-9 * page 5361 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)82385-1 | [Y] - F. ASINGER, ET AL., "Thiazolidin-nitrile-(4), -(thio)amide-(4), -carbonsäuren-(4) und Penicillamin-Derivate aus Thiazolinen-delta3", JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, VERLAG CHEMIE, WEINHEIM, DE, (19661013), vol. 697, ISSN 0075-4617, pages 140 - 157, XP001096421 [Y] 1-9 * page 145 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jlac.19666970110 | [Y] - T. SHIRAIWA, ET AL., "Asymmetric transformation of (R,S)-cysteine via formation of (R,S)-4-thiazolidinecarboxylic acids", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, JAPAN PUBLICATIONS TRADING, TOKYO, JP, (198901), vol. 62, no. 1, pages 109 - 113, XP002318319 [Y] 1-9 * page 110, column L, line 13 - line 54 * | [A] - T. SHIRAIWA, ET AL., "Asymmetric transformation of DL-4-thiazolidinecarboxylic acid", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (198710), no. 10, ISSN 0366-7022, pages 2041 - 2042, XP002163219 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - T. SHIRAIWA, ET AL., "Racemic structure and optical resolution by preferential crystallisation of DL-cysteine salts of subsitiuted benzenesulphonic acids", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, JAPAN PUBLICATIONS TRADING, TOKYO, JP, (198711), vol. 60, no. 11, pages 3985 - 3990, XP008043167 [A] 1-9 * page 3986, column L * | [A] - T. FRÜH, ET AL., "Natural products as pesticides: two examples of stereoselective synthesis", PESTICIDE SCIENCE, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE, LONDON, GB, (199601), vol. 46, no. 1, ISSN 0031-613X, pages 37 - 47, XP001156566 [A] 1-9 * page 43; figures 10,11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9063(199601)46:1<37::AID-PS339>3.0.CO;2-K |