EP1694552 - ROOF EXTENSION FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE CAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMB, Stephan Beutelsbacher Strasse 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | 02 /
LINDEMANN, Ingrid Amselweg 7/3 71120 Grafenau / DE | 03 /
SAIBER, Oswald Weissdornweg 3 72160 Horb / DE | 04 /
SCHULLER, Karl-Heinz In der Steige 5 71134 Aidlingen / DE | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/41] |
Former [2006/35] | Schüll, Gottfried Hubert COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04797915.8 | 16.11.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004EP12960 | Priority number, date | DE2003159514 | 18.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10359514 | [2006/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005058675 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1694552 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/06 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
B62D33/06 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DACHAUFSATZ F R EIN FAHRERHAUS EINES NUTZFAHRZEUGS | [2006/35] | English: | ROOF EXTENSION FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE CAB | [2006/35] | French: | LANTERNEAU POUR CABINE DE CONDUCTEUR DE VEHICULE UTILITAIRE | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 14.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5927893 (IMAMURA YOSHIHAYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9,13 * page 2, line 19 - line 21 * * figure 1 *; | [X]JP2002248943 ; | [X]DE1804687 (BUDD CO) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [A]US1523636 (DUNN WILLIAM G) [A] 1,13 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030114), vol. 2003, no. 01, & JP2002248943 A 20020903 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-3,9 * abstract * |