EP1689928 - PROCESS FOR DYEING CELLULOSIC FIBRE MATERIALS WITH AT LEAST TWO VAT DYES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman Advanced Materials (Switzerland) GmbH Klybeckstrasse 200 4057 Basel / CH | [2006/34] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEIBLI, Peter Neuhofweg 29 CH-4102 Binningen / CH | 02 /
HILDEBRAND, Rainer Tüllinger Strasse 60 79539 Lörrach / DE | [2006/33] | Application number, filing date | 04798131.1 | 01.11.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004EP52740 | Priority number, date | EP20030104133 | 10.11.2003 Original published format: EP 03104133 | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005045124 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1689928 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D06P1/22, D06P1/24, C09B7/00, C09B9/02, D06P3/60 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
C09B67/0038 (EP,US);
C09B67/0033 (EP,US);
D06P1/22 (EP,US);
D06P1/228 (EP,US);
D06P1/24 (EP,US);
D06P3/6025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FÄRBEN VON CELLULOSEFASERMATERIALIEN MIT MINDESTENS ZWEI KÜPENFARBSTOFFEN | [2006/33] | English: | PROCESS FOR DYEING CELLULOSIC FIBRE MATERIALS WITH AT LEAST TWO VAT DYES | [2006/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE TEINTURE DE MATIERES FIBREUSES CELLULOSIQUES AVEC DES COLORANTS DE CUVE | [2006/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 10.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2209143 (BASF AG) [X] 10 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1 *; | [A]EP0343925 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 4 - line 41 *; | [A]DE2917961 (ACNA) [A] 1-10 * example 2 *; | [A] - GUIDO EBNER DIETER SCHELZ, Textilfärberei und Farbstoffe, BERLIN HEIDELBERG NEW YORK, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1989), XP002279293 [A] 1-10 * page 175 - page 177 * * page 236 - page 239 * |