EP1687589 - METHOD OF ERROR COMPENSATION IN A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE WITH AN ARTICULATING PROBE HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-Under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCMURTRY, David, Roberts Park Farm Stancombe Dursley Gloucestershire GL11 6AT / GB | 02 /
MCFARLAND, Geoff The Manse 22 Church Road Upper Cam Dursley Gloucestershire GL11 5PG / GB | 03 /
JONAS, Kevyn, Barry 18 Sunningdale Clifton Bristol BS8 2NF / GB | [2012/36] |
Former [2006/32] | 01 /
MCMURTRY, David, Roberts Park Farm Stancombe Dursley Gloucestershire GL11 6AT / GB | ||
02 /
MCFARLAND, Geoff The Manse 22 Church Road Upper Cam Dursley Gloucestershire GL11 5PG / GB | |||
03 /
JONAS, Kevyn, Barry 18 Sunningdale Clifton Bristol BS8 2NF / GB | Representative(s) | Dunn, Paul Edward, et al Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge, Glos. GL12 8JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Leland, Emma Clare, et al Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge GB-Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | ||
Former [2006/32] | Leland, Emma Clare, et al Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge GB-Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04798549.4 | 15.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004GB04830 | Priority number, date | GB20030026532 | 13.11.2003 Original published format: GB 0326532 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005050134 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1687589 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1687589 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/04 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
G01B5/0016 (EP,US);
G01B21/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FEHLERKOMPENSATION IN EINER KOORDINATENMESSMASCHINE MIT EINEM ARTIKULIERENDEN SONDENKOPF | [2006/32] | English: | METHOD OF ERROR COMPENSATION IN A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE WITH AN ARTICULATING PROBE HEAD | [2006/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMPENSATION D'ERREURS DANS UNE MACHINE DE MESURE DE COORDONNEES AVEC UNE TETE DE SONDE ARTICULEE | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH Carl Zeiss Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE Opponent's representative Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Straße 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | 02
05.06.2013
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Hexagon Technology Center GmbH Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 201 9435 Heerbrugg / CH Opponent's representative Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH Carl Zeiss Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE Opponent's representative Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | ||
02
05.06.2013
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Hexagon Technology Center GmbH Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 9435 Heerbrugg / CH Opponent's representative Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | |||
Former [2013/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH Carl Zeiss Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE Opponent's representative Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | ||
02
05.06.2013
Hexagon Technology Center GmbH Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 9435 Heerbrugg / CH Opponent's representative Harmann, Bernd-Günther Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | |||
Former [2013/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH Carl Zeiss Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE Opponent's representative Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 15.07.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.03.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.05.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 14.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.10.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/04] | Appeal following opposition | 05.07.2016 | Appeal received No. T1593/16 | 21.09.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.10.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.11.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 08.07.2016 | Appeal received No. T1593/16 | 12.09.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.10.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.11.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 14.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2004 | AT | 05.09.2012 | BE | 05.09.2012 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | NL | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | IE | 15.11.2012 | LU | 15.11.2012 | FR | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | ES | 16.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | GB | 15.11.2020 | IT | 15.11.2020 | [2021/49] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 15.11.2004 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
LU | 15.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IT | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 15.11.2004 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
LU | 15.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
LU | 15.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP1391684 (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,11,14-18 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * abstract *; | [X]US5138563 (DEBITSCH RASMUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 46 * * column 4, line 19 - line 26 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 20 * * abstract *; | [A]US6546643 (LOTZE WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 7, line 15 - column 9, line 62 * * abstract * | by applicant | US5138563 | EP1391684 |