EP1684742 - USE OF 1-OXADIBENZO [E,H] AZULENES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM DISEASES AND DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/31] | USE OF 1-OXADIBENZO E,H AZULENES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM DISEASES AND DISORDERS | ||
[2008/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline istrazivacki centar Zagreb d.o.o. Prilaz Baruna Filipovica 29 10000 Zagreb / HR | [2009/03] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline istrazivacki centar Zagreb d.o.o. Prilaz Baruna Filipovica 29 10000 Zagreb / HR | ||
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states PLIVA-ISTRAZIVACKI INSTITUT d.o.o. Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 10000 Zagreb / HR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERCEP, Mladen Majstora Radonje 10 10000 Zagreb / HR | 02 /
MESIC, Milan Slavenskog 8 10000 Zagreb / HR | 03 /
PESIC, Dijana Prokljanska 18 22000 Sibenik / HR | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Nicolai, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2&3 81541 München / DE | [2006/31] | Application number, filing date | 04798731.8 | 19.11.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004HR00052 | Priority number, date | HR20030000955 | 21.11.2003 Original published format: HR 20030955 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005049010 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1684742 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1684742 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/343, A61K31/34, A61K31/38, A61K31/55, A61P25/00 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/34 (EP,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61K31/38 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | 31.05.2006 | HR | 31.05.2006 | LT | 31.05.2006 | LV | 31.05.2006 | MK | 31.05.2006 | YU | 31.05.2006 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON 1-OXADIBENZO [E,H] AZULENEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN FORMULIERUNGEN FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG UND PRÄVENTION VON ERKRANKUNGEN UND STÖRUNGEN DES ZENTRALEN NERVENSYSTEMS | [2008/51] | English: | USE OF 1-OXADIBENZO [E,H] AZULENES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM DISEASES AND DISORDERS | [2008/51] | French: | UTILISATION DE 1-OXADIBENZO [E, H] AZULENES POUR LA FABRICATION DE PREPARATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES DESTINEES AU TRAITEMENT ET A LA PREVENTION DE MALADIES ET DE TROUBLES DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2008/51] |
Former [2006/31] | VERWENDUNG VON 1-OXADIBENZO E,H AZULENEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN FORMULIERUNGEN FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG UND PRÄVENTION VON ERKRANKUNGEN UND STÖRUNGEN DES ZENTRALEN NERVENSYSTEMS | ||
Former [2006/31] | USE OF 1-OXADIBENZO E,H AZULENES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM DISEASES AND DISORDERS | ||
Former [2006/31] | UTILISATION DE 1-OXADIBENZO E, H AZULENES POUR LA FABRICATION DE PREPARATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES DESTINEES AU TRAITEMENT ET A LA PREVENTION DE MALADIES ET DE TROUBLES DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2009 | CY | 14.01.2009 | CZ | 14.01.2009 | DK | 14.01.2009 | EE | 14.01.2009 | FI | 14.01.2009 | NL | 14.01.2009 | PL | 14.01.2009 | RO | 14.01.2009 | SI | 14.01.2009 | SK | 14.01.2009 | TR | 14.01.2009 | BG | 14.04.2009 | SE | 14.04.2009 | GR | 15.04.2009 | IS | 14.05.2009 | PT | 15.06.2009 | HU | 15.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
HU | 15.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 14.01.2009 | |
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 14.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9738991 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [DY] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO9919317 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [DY] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DPX]WO03097649 (PLIVA D D [HR], et al) [DPX] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 3; example -; claim - *; | [A] - BECKER H-D ET AL, "PHOTOCHEMISTRY OF THE ANTHRACENE CHROMOPHORE: NOVEL ISOMERIZATION OF 1-(9-ANTHRYL)-2-BENZOYLETHYLENES", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1985), vol. 26, no. 12, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 1589 - 1592, XP008045110 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)98559-9 |