EP1692113 - ARYL IMIDAZOLES AND THEIR USE AS ANTI-CANCER AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptose Biosciences Inc. 5955 Airport Road, Suite 228 Mississauga, ON L4V 1R9 / CA | [2018/11] |
Former [2017/39] | For all designated states Lorus Therapeutics Inc. 2 Meridian Road Toronto, Ontario M9W 4Z7 / CA | ||
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Lorus Therapeutics Inc. 2 Meridian Road Toronto, Ontario M9W 4Z7 / CA | ||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states GeneSense Technologies Inc. 2 Meridian Road Toronto, Ontario M9W 4Z7 / CA | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Lorus Therapeutics Inc. 2 Meridian Road Toronto, Ontario M9W 4Z7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUESCA, Mario 26 Harris Park Drive Toronto, Ontario M1L 3A2 / CA | 02 /
AL-QAWASMEH, Raed 15 Vicora Linkway Apt. 1004 North York, Ontario M3C 1A8 / CA | 03 /
YOUNG, Aiping, H. 201 Senlac Road North York, Ontario M2R 1P3 / CA | 04 /
LEE, Yoon 2219 Corsair Road Mississauga, Ontario L5A 2L7 / CA | 05 /
LOCK Lisa 49 Devon Road Toronto, Ontario, M4E 2J7 / CA | [2007/44] |
Former [2006/34] | 01 /
HUESCA, Mario 26 Harris Park Drive Toronto, Ontario M1L 3A2 / CA | ||
02 /
AL-QAWASMEH, Raed 15 Vicora Linkway Apt. 1004 North York, Ontario M3C 1A8 / CA | |||
03 /
YOUNG, Aiping, H. 201 Senlac Road North York, Ontario M2R 1P3 / CA | |||
04 /
LEE, Yoon 2219 Corsair Road Mississauga, Ontario L5A 2L7 / CA | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | ||
Former [2006/34] | Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04799154.2 | 15.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004IB52433 | Priority number, date | US20030520279P | 14.11.2003 Original published format: US 520279 P | US20040599509P | 06.08.2004 Original published format: US 599509 P | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005047266 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692113 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692113 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/54, C07D235/02, C07D401/04, C07D401/14, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, C07D471/04, C07D471/14, C07D495/04, A61K31/4164, A61K31/4178, A61K31/4184, A61K31/4188 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/4188 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
C07D235/02 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | C07D233/58, C07D235/02, C07D401/04, C07D401/14, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, C07D471/04, C07D471/14, C07D495/04, A61K31/4164, A61K31/4178, A61K31/4184, A61K31/4188 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/39] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ARYLIMIDAZOLE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ANTIKREBSMITTEL | [2006/34] | English: | ARYL IMIDAZOLES AND THEIR USE AS ANTI-CANCER AGENTS | [2006/34] | French: | IMIDAZOLES D'ARYLE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS ANTICANCEREUX | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 24.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2004 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | ES | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | IT | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | LU | 15.11.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 15.11.2004 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.11.2004 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.11.2004 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03087026 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-17 * page 14, line 1 - line 6; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO03066579 (AXYS PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claim - *; | [X]WO02072576 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims; examples 63-65,67,68,70-103,105-141,145,148,149,151,154,155,158,159,161,263-290,317,319-322 *; | [X]WO0126467 (ONTOGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO0224680 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 11; examples 4-7,14-23; claims 1,11 *; | [X]WO0059541 (SANKYO CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract *; | [X]WO9907701 (SUGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * example 3; claims 1-6,14,15; compound 235 *; | [X]EP0812829 (ONTOGEN CORP [US]) [X] 1-17 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9902155 (ONTOGEN CORP [US]) [X] 1-17 * claims 1-52,55-63,70,71 *; | [X]WO9736587 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 5,7-9 *; | [X]US3279918 (MARIA CASSIERS PAUL, et al) [X] 13,14 * column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 22; table 1; compounds 11-37 * | Examination | - Min Guan ET AL, "Bright red light-emitting electroluminescence devices based on a functionalized europium complex", New Journal of Chemistry, (20030101), vol. 27, no. 12, doi:10.1039/b305361j, ISSN 1144-0546, page 1731, XP055083545 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b305361j | - Ya Xiong ET AL, "Interaction of polypyridyl ruthenium(II) complexes containing non-planar ligands with DNA", Journal of the Chemical Society, Dalton Transactions, (19990101), no. 1, doi:10.1039/a806170j, ISSN 0300-9246, pages 19 - 24, XP055083547 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a806170j | - XU H ET AL, "Synthesis and spectroscopic RNA binding studies of [Ru(phen)2MHPIP]<2+> ", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1387-7003, (20030601), pages 766 - 768, (20030601), XP027113034 | - GAO D ET AL, "Synthesis and electroluminescence properties of an organic europium complex", JOURNAL OF ALLOYS AND COMPOUNDS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (20030825), vol. 358, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0925-8388(03)00048-3, ISSN 0925-8388, pages 188 - 192, XP004448427 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-8388(03)00048-3 | - Hong Xu ET AL, "Effects of the ancillary ligands of polypyridyl ruthenium(ii) complexes on the DNA-binding behaviors", New Journal of Chemistry, (20030101), vol. 27, no. 8, doi:10.1039/b212826h, ISSN 1144-0546, page 1255, XP055083557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b212826h |