EP1682261 - METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT MULTIPLE BINDING REACTIONS IN AN ARRAY FORMAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/30] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT MULTIPLE BINDING REACTIONS IN AN ARRAY FORMAT | ||
[2012/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO-RAD Haifa Ltd. Technion Campus Gutwirth Science Park 32000 Haifa / IL | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOTCOVICH, Ariel G. 28 Vardya Street Apt 1 34657 Haifa / IL | 02 /
HERSCHHORN, Alon 12 Ofakim Street apt 23 36770 Nesher / IL | 03 /
NIMRI, Shai Kibbutz Sarid 30099 Kibbutz Sarid / IL | 04 /
BARICH, John 2273 Arcadia Court Martinez, CA 94553 / US | 05 /
LIPSON, Ariel 12 Burla Steet apt 16 32811 Haifa / IL | 06 /
BOAZ, Ran 9 Ruth Street 34404 Haifa / IL | 07 /
LIPSON, Doron 4 Kahanstam St. 62193 Tel Aviv / IL | 08 /
LEVIE, Yaakov Mitzpe Tzurit P.O.Box 116 20104 Misgav / IL | [2012/33] |
Former [2006/30] | 01 /
NOTCOVICH, Ariel G. 28 Vardya Street Apt 1 34657 Haifa / IL | ||
02 /
HERSCHHORN, Alon 12 Ofakim Street, apt 23 36770 Nesher / IL | |||
03 /
NIMRI, Shai Kibbutz Sarid 30099 Kibbutz Sarid / IL | |||
04 /
BARICH, John 2273 Arcadia Court Martinez, CA 94553 / US | |||
05 /
LIPSON, Ariel 12 Burla Steet, apt 16 32811 Haifa / IL | |||
06 /
BOAZ, Ran 9 Ruth Street 34404 Haifa / IL | |||
07 /
LIPSON, Doron 4 Kahanstam St. 62193 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
08 /
LEVIE, Yaakov Mitzpe Tzurit, P.O.Box 116 20104 Misgav / IL | Representative(s) | Kaminski, Zbigniew, et al Zbigniew Kaminski Ryszard Skubisz European Patent Attorneys Widenmayerstrasse 50 80538 München / DE | [2012/33] |
Former [2006/30] | Kaminski, Zbigniew, et al Zbigniew Kaminski Ryszard Skubisz European Patent Attorneys Widenmayerstrasse 50 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04799351.4 | 14.11.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004IL01043 | Priority number, date | US20030518878P | 12.11.2003 Original published format: US 518878 P | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005046859 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1682261 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1682261 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, G01N33/557, G01N33/543 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
C40B30/04 (EP,US);
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
G01N21/553 (EP,US);
G01N21/648 (EP,US);
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US);
G01N33/557 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00657 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0636 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0877 (EP,US);
B01L3/5025 (EP,US);
G01N2021/0346 (EP,US);
G01N2021/212 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6439 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6463 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00158 (EP,US);
G01N21/05 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG MEHRERER BINDUNGSREAKTIONEN IN ARRAYFORMAT | [2012/12] | English: | METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT MULTIPLE BINDING REACTIONS IN AN ARRAY FORMAT | [2012/12] | French: | METHODE DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE REACTIONS DE LIAISON MULTIPLES DANS UN FORMAT DE JEU ORDONNE | [2012/12] |
Former [2006/30] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG MEHRERER BINDUNGSREAKTIONEN IN ARRAYFORMAT | ||
Former [2006/30] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT MULTIPLE BINDING REACTIONS IN AN ARRAY FORMAT | ||
Former [2006/30] | SYSTEME ET METHODE DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE REACTIONS DE LIAISON MULTIPLES DANS UN FORMAT DE JEU ORDONNE | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 19.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2004 | AT | 15.08.2012 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | IT | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | IE | 14.11.2012 | LU | 14.11.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LU | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5429807 (MATSON ROBERT S [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 16 * * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 60 - column 7, line 4 * * figures 1,2,5-8; claims 1,2,5-8,11,12,14-17 *; | [X]US6200814 (MALMQVIST MAGNUS [SE], et al) [X] 12-17 * column 3, lines 15-40 * * column 4, lines 4-39 * * column 10, lines 5-44 * * column 11, lines 7-22 * * column 13, lines 30-58 * * column 15, line 37 - column 16, line 27 * * figures 13A-13E; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US6268141 (MATSON ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 12,17 * column 2, lines 19-37 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 9 * * column 4, line 56 - column 9, line 15 * * column 10, lines 22-46 * * claims 1,12,14-17 *; | [X]US6498010 (FITZGERALD STEPHEN PETER [GB], et al) [X] 12,17 * column 3, lines 36-53 * * column 5, lines 17-47 * * column 5, line 64 - column 7, line 34 * * example 1; claims 1,3,4,6-9,17,18 *; | [Y]US2003128043 (ZELTZ PATRIC [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0053] * * figures 1-8; claims 1,11,13 *; | [A]WO03056296 (KLAKAMP SCOTT L [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [YX]WO03065041 (SRU BIOSYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 3, lines 6-25 * * page 4, line 17 - page 6, line 13 * * page 17, lines 5-15 * * page 23, line 20 - page 26, line 17 * * page 31, line 22 - page 35, line 2 * * page 38, line 6 - page 40, line 7 * * page 46, line 18 - page 48, line 3 * * page 51, line 22 - page 52, line 7 * * figures 18,33,42; example 14; claims 1,12,14-19,23-26,41,42 * * page 9, lines 1-9 * * page 18, lines 19-21 * * page 40, line 8 - page 41, line 4 * * page 45, lines 12-20 * * figure 9; example 8 * [X] 12; | [X]US2003198967 (MATSON ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 12,17 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] * * examples 1-5; claims 1,2,4,5,10,11 *; | [XY] - KARLSSON ROBERT ET AL, "Surface Plasmon Resonance Detection and Multispot Sensing for Direct Monitoring of Interactions Involving Low-Molecular-Weight Analytes and for Determination of Low Affinities", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 228, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 274 - 280, XP002319706 [X] 1-6,12 * page 274, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 275, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 275, column R, paragraph L - page 277, column R, paragraph L * * page 278, column R, paragraph 3 - page 280, column R, paragraph L * * figures 2-4 * [Y] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1995.1350 | [X] - LOFAS S ET AL, "BIOANALYSIS WITH SURFACE PLASMON RESONANCE", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (19910801), vol. B05, no. 1 / 4, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 79 - 84, XP000265940 [X] 12,13,17 * figure 2 * * page 79, column R, paragraph L * * page 82, column L, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-4005(91)80224-8 |