EP1698844 - GAS LIQUEFYING PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JGC Corporation 2-3-1, Minato Mirai Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | [2020/11] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states JGC Corporation 2-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIJIMA, Takayuki c/o JGC Corporation, 3-1 Minatomirai 2-chome Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
FUKUOKA, Shinichi c/o JGC Corporation, 3-1 Minatomirai 2-chome Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
TAKEZAWA, Naoyuki c/o JGC Corporation, 3-1 Minatomirai 2-chome Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2021/13] |
Former [2006/36] | 01 /
IIJIMA, Takayuki, JGC Corporation 3-1, Minatomirai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | ||
02 /
FUKUOKA, Shinichic/o JGC Corporation 3-1, Minatomirai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKEZAWA, Naoyuki 3-1, Minatomirai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | Representative(s) | Ahner, Philippe, et al Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 Bis Esplanade de La Défense CS 60347 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Ahner, Philippe, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2013/13] | Ahner, Philippe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/36] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04799702.8 | 09.11.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004JP16921 | Priority number, date | JP20030387748 | 18.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003387748 | [2006/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005050109 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1698844 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1698844 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F25J1/00, F25J1/02 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
F25J1/0022 (EP,US);
F25J1/0214 (EP,US);
F25J1/0258 (US);
F25J1/0259 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/36] | F25J1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/28] |
Former [2006/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GASVERFLÜSSIGUNGSANLAGE | [2006/36] | English: | GAS LIQUEFYING PLANT | [2006/36] | French: | INSTALLATION DESTINEE A LIQUEFIER DU GAZ | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2006 | Translation filed | 22.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 09.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2004 | AT | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | CZ | 14.07.2021 | DK | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | ES | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | IT | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | NL | 14.07.2021 | PL | 14.07.2021 | RO | 14.07.2021 | SE | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | GB | 09.11.2021 | IE | 09.11.2021 | LU | 09.11.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | PT | 15.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
GB | 09.11.2021 | ||
IE | 09.11.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
GB | 09.11.2021 | ||
IE | 09.11.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
GB | 09.11.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
NL | 14.07.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9859207 (EXXON PRODUCTION RESEARCH CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 5 * * page 5, line 23 - line 26 ** page 7, line 15 - page 10, line 31 * | International search | [Y]JP2000180048 (AIR PROD & CHEM); | [Y]JPH02106689 (AIR PROD & CHEM); | [Y]JPH10170144 (NIPPON OXYGEN CO LTD) |