EP1807921 - MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR IN-HOUSE POWER QUANTITY CONSUMED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAEK, Seung-Myun Lucky Apt. 12-403, Banlim-Dong, Changwon-Shi Kyungsangnam-Do 641-764 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Koon-Seok Sungwon Apt. 102-1406, 45-1 Sangnam-Dong Changwon-Shi, Kyungsangnam-Do 641-778 / KR | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04799988.3 | 02.11.2004 | [2007/29] | WO2004KR02797 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006049356 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1807921 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/14, H02J13/00, G05F1/66 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
G01D4/004 (EP,US);
H02J3/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/2823 (EP,US);
G01D2204/24 (EP);
H02J13/00004 (EP,US);
H02J13/00007 (EP,US);
H02J2310/12 (EP);
H02J2310/70 (EP);
Y02B70/30 (EP,US);
Y02B70/3225 (EP,US);
Y02B90/20 (EP,US);
Y04S20/20 (US);
Y04S20/222 (EP,US);
Y04S20/242 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR HAUSINTERN VERBRAUCHTE STROMMENGE | [2007/29] | English: | MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR IN-HOUSE POWER QUANTITY CONSUMED | [2007/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE LA CONSOMMATION D' NERGIE DOMESTIQUE | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 29.12.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0620631 (ZELTRON SPA [IT]); | [X]JPH11178247 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JP2001024179 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2001054176 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [X]JP2003021654 (NEC YONEZAWA LTD); | [X]JP2003235182 (RICOH KK); | [A]EP1367685 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]); | [X]EP1372238 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]); | [A]EP1403998 (WRAP SPA [IT]); | [X]EP1441430 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) |