EP1829347 - METHOD AND SYSTEM TO DETERMINE ONE OR MORE PROPERTIES OF A DIGITAL SUBSCRIBER LINE USING AN ADAPTIVE FINITE IMPULSE RESPONSE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/36] | METHOD AND SYSTEM TO DETERMINE ONE OR MORE PROPERTIES OF A DIGITAL SUBSCRIBER LINE USING A TIME VARIABLE FINITE IMPULSE RESPONSE FILTER | ||
[2012/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) Telefonplan 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) Telefonplan 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDQVIST, Fredrik Blackensvägen 22A S-125 34 Alvsjo / SE | 02 /
BORJESSON, Per, Ola Sodra Esplanaden 29 S-223 52 Lund / SE | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN Implementation & Core (PU-KRIC) Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit KRIC 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2012/16] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan Ericsson AB Patent Unit IP Networks Box 1505 125 25 Älvsjö / SE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan Ericsson AB Patent Unit IP Networks Box 1505 125 25 Älvsjö / SE | Application number, filing date | 04801288.4 | 01.12.2004 | [2007/36] | WO2004IB03955 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006059175 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1829347 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1829347 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/30, H04L1/24 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
H04M3/305 (EP,US);
H04M3/2209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/05] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER ODER MEHRERER EIGENSCHAFTEN EINES DIGITALEN TEILNEHMERANSCHLUSSES UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES ADAPTIVEN FIR-FILTERS | [2012/04] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM TO DETERMINE ONE OR MORE PROPERTIES OF A DIGITAL SUBSCRIBER LINE USING AN ADAPTIVE FINITE IMPULSE RESPONSE FILTER | [2012/04] | French: | DETERMINATION DE CARACTERISTIQUES D'UNE LIGNE D'ABONNE NUMERIQUE EN UTILISANT UN FILTRE ADAPTIF À RÉPONSE EN IMPULSION FINIE | [2012/04] |
Former [2007/36] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER ODER MEHRERER EIGENSCHAFTEN EINES DIGITALEN TEILNEHMERANSCHLUSSES UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES ZEITVARIABLEN FIR-FILTERS | ||
Former [2007/36] | METHOD AND SYSTEM TO DETERMINE ONE OR MORE PROPERTIES OF A DIGITAL SUBSCRIBER LINE USING A TIME VARIABLE FINITE IMPULSE RESPONSE FILTER | ||
Former [2007/36] | DETERMINATION DE CARACTERISTIQUES D'UNE LIGNE D'ABONNE NUMERIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2004 | AT | 18.04.2012 | BE | 18.04.2012 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | NL | 18.04.2012 | PL | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SE | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SK | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | ES | 29.07.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | IE | 01.12.2012 | LU | 01.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 01.12.2012 | ||
LU | 01.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 01.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 01.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2002169585 (JONES KEITH R [US], et al) [I] 1-22,1-22,1-22 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0017] *; | [I]US6534996 (AMRANY DANIEL [US], et al) [I] 1-22,1-22,1-22 * column 1, line 57 - line 67 * * column 5, line 2 - column 6, line 48 * * column 1, line 57 - line 67 * * column 5, line 2 - column 6, line 48 * * column 1, line 57 - line 67 ** column 5, line 2 - column 6, line 48 *; | [I]US2003173399 (LE HENAFF DIDIER [FR]) [I] 1-22,1-22,1-22 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0060] * | by applicant | US2003173399 | - GALLI ET AL., "Loop Makeup Identification Via Single Ended Testing: Beyond Mere Loop Qualification", IEEE J. SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (200206), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 923 - 935 |