EP1690106 - CARRIER PHASE GPS POSITIONING DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Correction of patent specification | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2007/33] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAGAWA, Kazunori TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA, Masashi TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | 03 /
TAJIMA, Yasuhiro TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | 04 /
ONOME, Hirohisa TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB, et al Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, et al Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, et al Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04801628.1 | 02.12.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004JP18328 | Priority number, date | JP20030403640 | 02.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003403640 | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005054889 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1690106 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1690106 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1690106 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/00 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
G01S19/46 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/14 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/44 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/11] |
Former [2006/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGERPHASEN-GPS-POSITIONSBESTIMMUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2006/33] | English: | CARRIER PHASE GPS POSITIONING DEVICE AND METHOD | [2006/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE LOCALISATION GPS A PHASE DE PORTEUSE | [2006/33] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5903236 (LAWRENCE DAVID G [US]) [X] 1-6,10-17 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 39; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6373432 (RABINOWITZ MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 13,16 * column 5, lines 21-35; figures 1-3 * * column 15, line 2 - column 29, line 15 *; | [X]US6127968 (LU GANG [US]) [X] 13,16 * column 17, line 66 - column 19, line 51; figure 1 *; | [A]US5502641 (ISOMURA HIDETOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,13-17 * column 6, line 45 - column 10, line 31; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2001020216 (LIN CHING-FANG [US]) [A] 7-9 * paragraphs [0083] - [0096]; figures 5-11 * |