EP1701736 - Flt-3L for use in the prevention of diabetes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/38] | THERAPEUTIC AGENTS AND USES THEREFOR | ||
[2010/13] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WALTER AND ELIZA HALL INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH 1G Royal Parade Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHORTMAN, Ken 92 Wilson Street Carlton North, Victoria 3054 / AU | 02 /
O'KEEFFE, Meredith 10 Hudson Grove West Brunswick, Victoria 3055 / AU | 03 /
FANCKE, Ben 4 Kelvin Grove Ashburton, Victoria 3147 / AU | 04 /
HARRISON, Len 27 Park Street St Kilda West, Victoria 3182 / AU | 05 /
STEPTOE, Ray 16 Glenlyon Drive Ashgrove, Queensland 4060 / AU | 06 /
VREMEC, David 2 Brett Place Ferntree Gully, Victoria 3156 / AU | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Jones, Elizabeth Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Jones, Elizabeth Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04802141.4 | 23.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004AU01840 | Priority number, date | AU20030907195 | 24.12.2003 Original published format: AU 2003907195 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005060992 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1701736 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61P3/10 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
A61K38/17 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | A61P3/10 | ||
Former IPC [2006/38] | A61K38/45, A61K38/19, A61P35/00, A61P37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flt-3L zur Vorbeugung von Diabetes | [2010/30] | English: | Flt-3L for use in the prevention of diabetes | [2010/13] | French: | Flt-3L pour la prévention du diabète | [2010/30] |
Former [2006/38] | THERAPEUTISCHE MITTEL UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | ||
Former [2006/38] | THERAPEUTIC AGENTS AND USES THEREFOR | ||
Former [2006/38] | AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES ET UTILISATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 17.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/18] | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5554512 (LYMAN STEWART D [US], et al) [Y] 3,5,6,27 * claims 1-21 * * column 3, line 25 - line 31 * * column 3, line 32 - line 39 * * column 4, line 33 - line 39 *; | [YX]WO02080952 (LORANTIS LTD [GB], et al) [YX] 1,2,11-14,22-26 * claims 1,19 * * page 86, line 9 - line 13 * * claims 22-25 * * page 86, line 9 - page 93, line 3 *; | [Y]WO03078573 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [Y] 4-6,15 * page 7, line 8 - line 22 *; | [Y]JP2003277289 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) [Y] 4-6,15 * claim 10 *; | [Y]WO03089602 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [Y] 4-6,15 * claims 1-24 *; | [Y] - CLARE-SALZLER, M.J. ET AL, "Prevention of diabetes in nonobese diabetic mice by dendritic cell transfer", J.CLINICAL INVESTIGATIONS, (1992), vol. 90, pages 741 - 748, XP002473948 [Y] 1-6,11-15,22-27 * page 747, paragraph 5 - page 748, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI115946 | International search | [A]WO02067760 (BAYLOR RES INST [US]); | [A]WO02100317 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al); | [X]US2003113341 (LYNCH DAVID H [US], et al); | [X] - MALISZEWSKI C., "Dendritic cells in models of tumor immunity. Role of Flt3 ligand", PATHOL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 49, pages 481 - 483, XP002988636 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0369-8114(01)00172-9 | [X] - MOREL P. ET AL, "Immunobiology of DC in NOD mice", J. LEUK. BIOL., (1999), vol. 66, pages 276 - 280, XP008049898 | [X] - MCNEEL D.G. ET AL, "Pilot Study of an HLA-A2 Peptide Vaccine Using Flt3 Ligand as a Systemic Vaccine Adjuvant", J. CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 62 - 72, XP002988637 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1021904432489 | [X] - DONG J. ET AL, "Flt-3 Ligand A Potent Dendritic Cell Stimulator and Novel Antitumor AGENT", CANCER BIOLOGY & THERAPY, (2002), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 486 - 488, XP008049899 | [X] - RINI B. I. ET AL, "Flt-3 Ligand and Sequential FL/Interleukin-2 in Patients With Metastatic Renal Carcinoma: Clinical and Biologic Activity", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOTHERAPY, (2002), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 269 - 277, XP008049904 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00002371-200205000-00010 | by applicant | WO9007936 | EP0425731 | WO9219195 | WO9501203 | WO9505452 | WO9602286 | WO9602646 | WO9611698 | WO9640959 | WO9712635 | WO02080952 | - DONG J. ET AL., CANCER BIOLOGY & THERAPY, (2002), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 486 - 488 | - O'KEEFFE ET AL., J EXP MED, (2002), vol. 196, pages 1307 - 1319 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, page 3389 | - AUSUBEL ET AL., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS INC, pages 1994 - 1998 | - CLARE-SALZLER ET AL., J. CLINICAL INVESTIGATIONS, (1992), vol. 90, pages 741 - 748 | - WELLS, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1991), vol. 202, pages 2699 - 2705 | - MARMUR; DOTY, J. MOL. BIOL., (1962), vol. 5, page 109 | - BONNER; LASKEY, EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1974), vol. 46, page 83 |