EP1695524 - BACK UP OF NETWORK DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avaya Canada Corp. Suite 900 1959 Upper Water Street Halifax Nova Scotia B3J 3N2 / CA | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POUSTCHI, Behrouz 51 Evanshen Cres. Ottawa, Ontario K2K 2Z7 / CA | 02 /
GAGNON, Natalie, Ann 165 Spruce Cres. R.R. 1 Carleton Place, Ontario K7C 3P1 / CA | 03 /
BELL, Jennifer Apt 410, 3555 Atwater Ave Montreal, Quebec H3H 1Y3 / CA | [2006/51] |
Former [2006/35] | 01 /
POUSTCHI, Behrouz 51 Evanshen Cres. Ottawa, Ontario K2K 2Z7 / CA | ||
02 /
GAGNON, Natalie, Ann 165 Spruce Cres. R.R. 1 Carleton Place, Ontario K7C 3P1 / CA | |||
03 /
BELL, Jennifer 303-151 Metcalf Street Ottawa, Ontario K2P 1N8 / CA | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2006/35] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04802184.4 | 22.11.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004CA02005 | Priority number, date | US20030523703P | 21.11.2003 Original published format: US 523703 P | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005050952 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1695524 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1695524 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 02.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/14, H04L12/24, H04Q3/00, H04L29/08, H04M7/00 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
H04Q3/0075 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,KR,US);
G06F11/2035 (EP,KR,US);
G06F11/2097 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/22 (KR);
H04L65/40 (KR);
H04L67/104 (EP,US);
H04L67/1048 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/1068 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/535 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,KR,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/35] | H04L29/14, H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2016/27] |
Former [2007/09] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BACK UP VON NETZWERKEINRICHTUNGEN | [2006/35] | English: | BACK UP OF NETWORK DEVICES | [2006/35] | French: | SYSTEME DE SECOURS POUR DISPOSITIFS RESEAU | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 24.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.07.2016 | NL | 06.07.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | [2017/50] |
Former [2017/09] | IT | 06.07.2016 | |
NL | 06.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0106367 (COMMVAULT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-29* page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 25 *; | [XP]EP1432204 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [XP] 1-29 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016] * | International search | [Y]WO0106367 (COMMVAULT SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [Y]US6505216 (SCHUTZMAN NEIL F [US], et al); | [A]US2003018657 (MONDAY PAUL B [US]); | [A]US2003126247 (STRASSER AMNON A [IL], et al) |