EP1694943 - TURBOMACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/35] | TURBOMACHINE, ESPECIALLY A GAS TURBINE | ||
[2012/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜCKNER, Gerhard Weilerstrasse 3 85250 Altomünster / DE | 02 /
FELDMANN, Manfred Biberweg 2 82223 Eichenau / DE | 03 /
KISLINGER, Bernd Müncher Strasse 20a 85276 Reisgang / DE | 04 /
WULF, Joachim Volkartstrasse 42 80636 München / DE | [2006/35] | Application number, filing date | 04802843.5 | 27.11.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004DE02634 | Priority number, date | DE2003159730 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10359730 | [2006/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005059312 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1694943 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1694943 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D25/24, F01D11/08 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
F01D9/042 (EP,US);
F01D11/08 (EP,US);
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F05B2260/301 (EP,US);
F05D2250/41 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/13] |
Former [2006/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TURBOMASCHINE | [2012/39] | English: | TURBOMACHINE | [2012/39] | French: | TURBOMACHINE | [2012/39] |
Former [2006/35] | ZENTRIERUNG DER LEITSCHAUFELKRÄNZE IN EINER TURBOMASCHINE SOWIE MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2006/35] | TURBOMACHINE, ESPECIALLY A GAS TURBINE | ||
Former [2006/35] | TURBOMOTEUR, NOTAMMENT TURBINE A GAZ | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 02.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.05.2013 | [2014/11] | Cited in | International search | [X]US2801075 (BROFFITT WILGUS S) [X] 1,3-5,11,12 * column 3, line 12 - line 24 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2910269 (LIONEL HAWORTH, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 30 - line 33 ** figure 1 *; | [A]US2971333 (PAUL MENDELSOHN JULIAN, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 69 *; | [Y]US3104091 (DENNIS VIVIAN WILLIAM EDWARD) [Y] 1,4-7,11,12 * column 1, line 59 - column 4, line 14 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4632634 (VINCIGUERRA COSTANTINO [IT], et al) [A] 1,4-7,11,12 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 10 - line 25 *; | [X]US5775874 (BOITE SYLVAIN [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-5,11 * column 2, line 6 - line 17 * * claim 1 * * figures 2,4,5 *; | [DY]DE19807247 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1,4-7,11,12 * column 4, line 20 - line 32 *; | [A]DE10037837 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2801075 | US3104091 | US5775874 | DE19807247 |