EP1692762 - ELECTRONIC DECOUPLING INDUCTOR FOR APPLICATIONS IN ACTUATOR SENSOR INTERFACE NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zentrum Mikroelektronik Dresden AG Grenzstrasse 28 01109 Dresden / DE | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGI, Michael Dorfstrasse 20 01257 Dresden / DE | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Adler, Peter, et al Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Adler, Peter, et al Lippert, Stachow & Partner Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Ilberg, Roland Ilberg - Weissfloh Patentanwälte Am Weissiger Bach 93 01328 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 04802872.4 | 03.12.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004DE02664 | Priority number, date | DE2003157332 | 05.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10357332 | [2006/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005057783 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692762 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/48, H04B3/54, H04B3/56 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
H03H11/42 (EP);
H03H11/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE ENTKOPPELINDUKTIVITÄT FÜR ANWENDUNGEN IN AKTUATOR-SENSOR-INTERFACE-NETZWERKEN | [2006/34] | English: | ELECTRONIC DECOUPLING INDUCTOR FOR APPLICATIONS IN ACTUATOR SENSOR INTERFACE NETWORKS | [2006/34] | French: | INDUCTANCE DE DECOUPLAGE ELECTRONIQUE DESTINEE A ETRE UTILISEE DANS DES RESEAUX DE TYPE INTERFACE ACTIONNEUR-CAPTEUR | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2000 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 11.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/24] | 22.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.02.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY] - ZMD AG, "ASI-SW Low End Device AS-Interface IC", DATA SHEET, REV. 1.2, GERMANY, (20021021), pages 1 - 2, XP002322080 [DY] 1-5 * the whole document * | [DY] - STRICT P, "GYRATOR ACTS AS ELECTRONIC CHOKE", ELECTRONICS WORLD (INCL. WIRELESS WORLD), REED BUSINESS PUBLISHING, SUTTON, SURREY, GB, (19930901), vol. 99, no. 1690, ISSN 0959-8332, page 754, XP000400575 [DY] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - KRIESEL W ET AL, "ASI IM UEBERBLICK", AKTUATOR SENSOR INTERFACE FUER DIE AUTOMATION, XX, XX, (1994), pages 11 - 60, XP002062938 [A] 1-5 * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 15; figures 1.2,1.5,3.1,3.2 * * page 26, paragraph 7 - page 27, paragraph 2 * * page 27, paragraphs 5,6 * * page 32, paragraphs 2-4,7 * * page 39, paragraphs 2-5 * * page 49 - page 50 * * page 55, paragraph 4 - page 56 * | [A] - TIETZE, U., SCHENK, C., "Halbleiter-Schaltungstechnik", SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN,DE, (1990), pages 382 - 387, XP002322081 [A] 1-5 * page 383, lines 1-3 * * page 385, lines 3,4 * | Examination | US4592069 |