EP1691944 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A CAST PART FROM A MOLTEN METAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bender, Wilfried Dasselstrasse 75-77 50674 Köln / DE | For all designated states Müller, Wolfgang Am Zwinger 15 96047 Bamberg / DE | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, et al Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, et al Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas Patentanwalt, Postfach 19 02 17 53037 Bonn / DE | Application number, filing date | 04802904.5 | 09.12.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004DE02698 | Priority number, date | DE2003157618 | 10.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10357618 | [2006/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005056218 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1691944 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1691944 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B22C9/06, B22D27/04 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
B22D27/045 (EP);
B22C9/068 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | B22D27/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES GUSSTEILS AUS EINER METALLSCHMELZE | [2006/34] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A CAST PART FROM A MOLTEN METAL | [2006/34] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE PIECE MOULEE A PARTIR DE METAL EN FUSION | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2004 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | IT | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | MC | 23.01.2013 | NL | 23.01.2013 | PL | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | ES | 04.05.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XDY]EP0571703 (TITAN-ALUMINIUM-FEINGUSS GMBH) [XD] 1-3,11-14,23,24 * claim 1 * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 14 - line 36 * * column 1, line 16 * * column 2, line 3 - line 7 * * column 5, line 38 - line 45 * * column 5, line 32 * * column 4, line 44 * * column 8, line 27 - line 38 * * column 1, line 18 * [Y] 4,6,8-10 [X] 7,15-22; | [Y]DE1194103 (RUDOLF KOPPATZ) [Y] 4,6,8,9 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * * column 2, lines 18-20 *; | [Y]FR2419780 (AVESTA JERNVERKS AB) [Y] 10 * figures 1,2 * |