EP1697646 - ARRANGEMENT FOR FIXING A HEAT EXCHANGER, PARTICULARLY A COOLING MODULE IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILBERT, Ralf Bruder-Konrad-Strasse 22 82216 Gernlinden / DE | [2015/33] |
Former [2006/36] | 01 /
WILBERT, Ralf Schulstrasse 22 82216 Gernlinden / DE | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas, et al Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Grauel, Andreas, et al Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstraße 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/42] | Grauel, Andreas, et al Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstrasse 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | Grauel, Andreas BEHR GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property G-IP Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04803228.8 | 23.11.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004EP13271 | Priority number, date | DE2003159357 | 16.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10359357 | [2006/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005059382 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697646 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697646 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/02, F16B33/00 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
F16B41/005 (EP,US);
F16B31/025 (EP,US);
F16B31/027 (EP,US);
F16B5/0241 (EP,US);
F16B33/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/36] | F16B41/00, F16B31/02, F16B23/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2006/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES WÄRMEÜBERTRAGERS, INSBESONDERE EINES KÜHLMODULS IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2015/32] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR FIXING A HEAT EXCHANGER, PARTICULARLY A COOLING MODULE IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2006/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FIXER UN ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR, EN PARTICULIER UN MODULE DE REFROIDISSEMENT, DANS UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR | [2006/36] |
Former [2006/36] | ANORDNUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES WÄRME BERTRAGERS, INSBESONDERE EINES KÜHLMODULS IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 05.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2004 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | ES | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | IT | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | PL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | AT | 23.11.2015 | GB | 23.11.2015 | IE | 23.11.2015 | LU | 23.11.2015 | BE | 30.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
AT | 23.11.2015 | ||
GB | 23.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
GB | 23.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
GR | 13.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE4030720 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 60 - line 69; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [Y] 7-18; | [Y]US6260609 (TAKAHASHI AKIO [JP]) [Y] 7-18 * column A; figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 13 - line 36 *; | [A]DE10207025 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 12-18 * column 7, line 51 - line 62 ** abstract * |