EP1697046 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CATALYTIC PREPARATION AND USE OF SAID CATALYTIC PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Venator Germany GmbH Dr. Rudolf-Sachtleben-Straße 4 47198 Duisburg / DE | [2019/18] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Sachtleben Chemie GmbH Rudolf-Sachtleben-Strasse 4 47198 Duisburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROFT, Bernd Geschwister-Scholl-Str. 6 47506 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | 02 /
HIRSCHBERG, Elke Ackerstr. 144 47447 Moers / DE | 03 /
OPTEHOSTERT, Regina Römerstr. 283 47441 Moers / DE | 04 /
WINKLER, Jochen Saelhuysen 30 47509 Rheurdt / DE | 05 /
PIPPLIES, Klaus Ludwig-Dell-Str. 4g 47506 Neukirchen-Vinyn / DE | 06 /
WEDLER, Michael Dr. Rheindeichstr. 61b 47198 Duisburg / DE | [2006/51] |
Former [2006/36] | 01 /
PROFT, Bernd Geschwister-Scholl-Str. 6 47506 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | ||
02 /
HIRSCHBERG, Elke Ackerstr. 144 47447 Moers / DE | |||
03 /
OPTEHOSTERT, Regina Römerstr. 283 47441 Moers / DE | |||
04 /
WINKLER, Jochen Saelhuysen 30 47509 Rheurdt / DE | |||
05 /
PIPPLIES, Klaus Ludwig-Dell-Str. 4g 47506 Neukirchen-Vinyn / DE | |||
06 /
WEDLER, Michael Jordingstrasse 1 47119 Duisburg / DE | Representative(s) | Nobbe, Matthias Seyer & Nobbe Patentanwälte Mülheimer Straße 210 47057 Duisburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | Nobbe, Matthias Demski & Nobbe Patentanwälte Mülheimer Strasse 210 47057 Duisburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Uppena, Franz Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | Uppena, Franz c/o Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 04803683.4 | 09.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004EP14026 | Priority number, date | DE20031059839 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10359839 | [2006/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005063395 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697046 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697046 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/00, C09C1/36, C01G23/047, C09C3/04, // B01J21/06 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
C09C3/041 (EP,US);
B01J37/0036 (EP,US);
C09C1/3623 (EP,US);
C01P2004/52 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/36] | B01J37/00, C09C1/36, C01G23/047 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/24] |
Former [2006/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KATALYSATORPRÄPARATION UND VERWENDUNG DER KATALYSATORPRÄPARATION | [2006/36] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CATALYTIC PREPARATION AND USE OF SAID CATALYTIC PREPARATION | [2006/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉALISER UNE PRÉ PARATION CATALYTIQUE ET UTILISATION DE CETTE PRÉPARATION CATALYTIQUE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.11.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.11.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2004 | CY | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | IS | 12.11.2019 | AT | 09.12.2019 | IE | 09.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | FR | 31.12.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/25] | CY | 12.06.2019 | |
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
AT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IE | 09.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | DK | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
IE | 09.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | DK | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
IE | 09.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | DK | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
IE | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | DK | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | DK | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | DK | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | EE | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | EE | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9805421 (ANZON INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 12, line 11 - line 22; example 1; claims 15,21,23 *; | [X]US5808143 (KARRER LOTHAR [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * column 3, line 36 - line 45; example 1 *; | [X]DE4308114 (OSER ERWIN DR [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 13 - line 27; claims 1,3 * * column 4, line 43 - line 55 * * column 5, line 12 - line 20 *; | [X]DE4417185 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 42 - line 51; example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US5068056 (ROBB JENIFER L [GB]) [X] 1-7 * claims 21,22 *; | [DX]EP0736560 (ZIMMER AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1-8 * page 3, line 52 - line 54; claims 1,2 * | Examination | EP1541638 |