EP1723832 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INFRARED RADIATOR ELEMENT AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Noblelight GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZISSING, Holger Hubertusstr. 1 36103 Flieden / DE | 02 /
LINOW, Sven Jahnstrasse 129 64285 Darmstadt / DE | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/47] | 01 /
ZISSING, Holger Hubertusstr. 1 36103 Flieden / DE | ||
02 /
LINOW, Sven Engelhardstr. 33 63450 Hanau / DE | Representative(s) | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2006/47] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Schutzrechte, Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 04803702.2 | 10.12.2004 | [2006/47] | WO2004EP14049 | Priority number, date | DE20041002357 | 15.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004002357 | [2006/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005069687 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1723832 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/00, H05B3/04 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
H05B3/009 (EP);
H05B3/04 (EP);
H05B2203/032 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES INFRAROTSTRAHLERELEMENTS SOWIE VERWENDUNG | [2006/47] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INFRARED RADIATOR ELEMENT AND USE THEREOF | [2006/47] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXPLOITATION D'UN ELEMENT A RAYONS INFRAROUGES ET UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTE | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 22.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/01] | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.09.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 29.09.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.09.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]DE10041564 (HERAEUS) [DY] 1,4-9,12-20 * claim 1 *; | [DY]FR2686967 (FRANCE TELECOM) [DY] 1,4-7,9,12-20 * page 5, line 28 - line 32 * * page 6, line 1 - line 3 * * page 5, line 29 *; | [DY]DE1960875 (VEPA) [DY] 8 * page 4 * |