EP1700133 - TECHNIQUE FOR COLLECTING AND USING INFORMATION ABOUT THE GEOGRAPHIC POSITION OF A MOBILE OBJECT ON THE EARTH'S SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORWANT, Jonathan, Lee 175 Second Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2006/37] | Application number, filing date | 04804121.4 | 20.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004EP14523 | Priority number, date | US20030751058 | 31.12.2003 Original published format: US 751058 | EP20040291828 | 16.07.2004 Original published format: EP 04291828 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005064358 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1700133 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/00 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
G01S5/0027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TECHNIK ZUM SAMMELN UND VERWENDEN VON INFORMATIONEN ÜBER DIE GEOGRAFISCHE POSITION EINES MOBILEN OBJEKTS AUF DER ERDOBERFLÄCHE | [2006/37] | English: | TECHNIQUE FOR COLLECTING AND USING INFORMATION ABOUT THE GEOGRAPHIC POSITION OF A MOBILE OBJECT ON THE EARTH'S SURFACE | [2006/37] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE COLLECTE ET D'UTILISATION D'INFORMATIONS CONCERNANT LA POSITION GEOGRAPHIQUE D'UN OBJET MOBILE SUR LA SURFACE DE LA TERRE | [2006/37] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/46] | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5594650 (SHAH MUKESH C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,17,18 * column 4, line 58 - column 6, line 34; figures 6,7 *; | [X]US5835907 (NEWMAN BRIAN [US]) [X] 1-6,17,18 * column 3, line 31 - column 8, line 32 *; | [X]US5922040 (PRABHAKARAN SANJIV [US]) [X] 1-6,17,18 * the whole document *; | [X] - ASHBROOK D ET AL, "Learning significant locations and predicting user movement with GPS", WEARABLE COMPUTERS, 2002. (ISWC 2002). PROCEEDINGS. SIXTH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEATTLE, WA, USA 7-10 OCT. 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20021007), ISBN 0-7695-1816-8, pages 101 - 108, XP010624587 [X] 1,11-17,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISWC.2002.1167224 | [X] - ASHBROOK D ET AL, "Using GPS to learn significant locations and predict movement across multiple users", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (20030911), Database accession no. 7895497, XP002453254 [X] 1,11-17,19 * abstract * | [ ] - Personal and Ubiquitous Computing Springer-Verlag UK, Online, (20030911), vol. 7, no. 5, ISSN 1617-4909, pages 275 - 286 | International search | [X]US5594650 (SHAH MUKESH C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,17,18 * column 4, line 58 - column 6, line 34; figures 6,7 *; | [X]US5835907 (NEWMAN BRIAN [US]) [X] 1-6,17,18 * column 3, line 31 - column 8, line 32 *; | [X]US5922040 (PRABHAKARAN SANJIV [US]) [X] 1-6,17,18* the whole document * |