EP1697189 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A VEHICLE STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAAB, Markus Römerstrasse 1 74912 Kirchhardt / DE | 02 /
STEIN, Alexander Lerchenweg 29 57642 Alpenrod / DE | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Pfeffer, Frank Daimler AG Intellectual Property Management IPM/E, HPC C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Pfeffer, Frank DaimlerChrysler AG Intellectual Property Management C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04804126.3 | 21.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004EP14528 | Priority number, date | DE2003160728 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10360728 | [2006/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005063536 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697189 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
B60T8/17551 (EP,US);
B60T2230/03 (EP,US);
B60T2270/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES FAHRZEUGZUSTANDES | [2006/36] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A VEHICLE STATE | [2006/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER L'ETAT D'UN VEHICULE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 02.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXAY]DE19515055 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [DX] 1,4,11-13 * claims 1-6 * * figures 1,9 * [A] 5,7 [Y] 2,3,9,10; | [Y]EP0826576 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [Y] 2 * page 8, line 45 - page 9, line 22 *; | [Y]EP0758601 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [Y] 3,9,10 * claims 3,6,8 *; | [X]DE4340932 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,12 * column 5, line 19 - line 24 * * claims 5,6 *; | [A]US6424907 (RIETH PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,12 * claim 1 * |