EP1704650 - OUTSIDE UNIT FOR SATELLITE RECEPTION AND METHOD OF RECEPTION WITH SAID UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2014/09] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOUCHKOFF, Marc 3 Chemin de la Louve F-13400 AUBAGNE / FR | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Rossmanith, Manfred, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Rossmanith, Manfred, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2010/29] | Rossmanith, Manfred, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/39] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON multimedia, 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04804832.6 | 15.12.2004 | [2006/39] | WO2004EP53477 | Priority number, date | FR20040000070 | 06.01.2004 Original published format: FR 0400070 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005069495 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1704650 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1704650 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/10, H04N7/20 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
H01Q1/247 (EP,US);
H01Q23/00 (EP,US);
H04B1/06 (KR);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04H40/90 (EP,US);
H04N7/20 (EP,US);
H03D7/161 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, TR [2007/15] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUSSENEINHEIT FÜR SATELLITENEMPFANG UND EMPFANGSVERFAHREN MIT DER EINHEIT | [2006/39] | English: | OUTSIDE UNIT FOR SATELLITE RECEPTION AND METHOD OF RECEPTION WITH SAID UNIT | [2006/39] | French: | UNITE EXTERIEURE DE RECEPTION SATELLITE ET PROCEDE DE RECEPTION DANS LADITE UNITE | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.06.2012 | 15.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.02.2014 | IT | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/18] | ES | 26.02.2014 | |
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 26.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP1198066 (PACE MICRO TECH PLC [GB]) [DA] 1-10 * page 3, column 3, line 31 - page 4, column 6, line 22 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9723052 (PACE MICRO TECH LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 20 * * figures 2-4 * |