EP1754249 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETACHING A COMPONENT WHICH IS ATTACHED TO A FLEXIBLE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kulicke & Soffa Die Bonding GmbH Andhausen 52 8572 Berg TG / CH | [2010/34] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states Alphasem Holding GmbH Andhausen 52 8572 Berg TG / CH | ||
Former [2009/45] | For all designated states Kulicke & Soffa Die Bonding GmbH Andhausen 52 8572 Berg TG / CH | ||
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Alphasem GmbH Andhausen 52 8572 Berg TG / CH | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Alphasem AG Andhauserstrasse 64 8572 Berg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRINKS, Joachim Bergstrasse 11 CH-9230 Flawil / CH | 02 /
MARTE, Andreas Sonnenhaldenstrasse 7 CH-8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | 03 /
HERBST, Wolfgang Bachgasse 6 78464 Konstanz / DE | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2009/44] |
Former [2007/08] | Wenger, René, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 04804931.6 | 17.12.2004 | [2007/08] | WO2004EP53593 | Priority number, date | CH20040000869 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: CH 8692004 | [2007/16] |
Former [2007/08] | CH20040086904 | 19.05.2004 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005117072 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754249 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
H01L21/67132 (EP,US);
H01L21/02 (KR);
Y10S438/976 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1132 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1944 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHUNG ZUM ABLÖSEN EINES AUF EINE FLEXIBLE FOLIE GEKLEBTEN BAUTEILS | [2007/08] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETACHING A COMPONENT WHICH IS ATTACHED TO A FLEXIBLE FILM | [2007/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ENLEVER UN COMPOSANT COLLE SUR UN FILM SOUPLE | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 08.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 06.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | EP10186245.6 / EP2306496 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH0376139 ; | [XAY]US2003075271 (YOSHIMOTO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 10,13-16 * the whole document * [A] 1 [Y] 4,9; | [XA]JPS63228638 ; | [XA]JP2001196443 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910621), vol. 0152, no. 41, Database accession no. (E - 1080), & JP03076139 A 19910402 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,5,6,8,10,12,17 * abstract * [Y] 4,9 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890120), vol. 0130, no. 26, Database accession no. (E - 706), & JP63228638 A 19880922 (SONY CORP) [X] 10,11 * abstract * [A] 1 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010511), vol. 2000, no. 24, & JP2001196443 A 20010719 (SHARP CORP) [X] 10,17,18 * abstract * [A] 1 |