EP1697404 - CC-CHEMOKINE BINDING TICK PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Serono SA Centre Industriel 1267 Coinsins, Vaud / CH | [2009/25] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Laboratoires Serono SA Centre Industriel 1267 Coinsins, Vaud / CH | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Applied Research Systems ARS Holding N.V. Pietermaai 15 Curacao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POWER, Christine 10, Rue des Jonquilles F-01710 Thoiry / FR | 02 /
PROUDFOOT, Amanda Sous Chens F-74140 Chens Sur Leman / FR | 03 /
FRAUENSCHUH, Achim Chemin des Voirets 1 CH-1228 Plan-les-Ouates-Genève / CH | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz 1170 Aubonne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Serono International S.A. Intellectual Property 12, Chemin des Aulx 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | Application number, filing date | 04804972.0 | 21.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004EP53638 | Priority number, date | EP20030104973 | 24.12.2003 Original published format: EP 03104973 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005063812 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1697404 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697404 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/435 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/43527 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | 16.05.2006 | BA | 16.05.2006 | HR | 16.05.2006 | LV | 16.05.2006 | MK | 16.05.2006 | YU | 16.05.2006 | Title | German: | CC-CHEMOKIN-BINDENDE ZECKENPROTEINE | [2006/36] | English: | CC-CHEMOKINE BINDING TICK PROTEINS | [2006/36] | French: | PROTEINES DE LIAISON A CC-CHEMOKINE DE LA TIQUE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 18.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.07.2009 | BE | 22.07.2009 | CY | 22.07.2009 | CZ | 22.07.2009 | DK | 22.07.2009 | EE | 22.07.2009 | FI | 22.07.2009 | LT | 22.07.2009 | NL | 22.07.2009 | PL | 22.07.2009 | RO | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | SI | 22.07.2009 | SK | 22.07.2009 | TR | 22.07.2009 | BG | 22.10.2009 | GR | 23.10.2009 | IS | 22.11.2009 | PT | 22.11.2009 | IE | 21.12.2009 | LU | 21.12.2009 | HU | 23.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
IE | 21.12.2009 | ||
LU | 21.12.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
IE | 21.12.2009 | ||
LU | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
IE | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0027873 (RES CORP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]WO0178770 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [A]US2003050244 (FUCHSBERGER NORBERT [SK], et al); |