EP1704114 - METHOD FOR ETCHING PHOSPHATE ORES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecophos Centre Monnet Avenue Jean Monnet 1 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2010/48] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Ecophos Rue Laid Burniat 3 1348 Louvain-la Neuve / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKHIM, Mohamed rue M. Yourcenar 11, boîte 101 B-1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Mellet, Valérie Martine, et al Abyoo sprl Centre Monnet Avenue Jean Monnet, 1 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Pecher, Nicolas, et al Pecher & de Groote sprl Centre Monnet Avenue Jean Monnet, 1 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Pecher, Nicolas, et al Pecher Consultants SPRL Centre Monnet - Avenue Jean Monnet, 1 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Intellectual Property House, Brussels Airport Business Park Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2006/39] | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 04805024.9 | 23.12.2004 | [2006/39] | WO2004EP53697 | Priority number, date | BE20030000683 | 24.12.2003 Original published format: BE 200300683 | [2006/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005066070 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1704114 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1704114 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/22, C01B25/32 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
C01B25/324 (EP,US);
C01B25/2212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÄTZEN VON PHOSPHATERZEN | [2006/39] | English: | METHOD FOR ETCHING PHOSPHATE ORES | [2006/39] | French: | PROCEDE D'ATTAQUE DE MINERAI DE PHOSPHATE | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2008 | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.02.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2004 | AT | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | IS | 20.05.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | [2018/28] |
Former [2017/47] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 20.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]RU2046757 ; | [XY]FR2115244 (UNITED STATES GYPSUM CO [US]) [X] 1-10,14 * claims 1,2,9,11 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 10 * * page 7, line 14 - line 16 * * example 2 * [Y] 11-13; | [Y]US3937783 (WAMSER CHRISTIAN A, et al) [Y] 11-13 * claims 1-4 * * column 8, line 26 - line 46 *; | [A]FR2289443 (UNITED STATES GYPSUM CO [US]) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-3,7,14 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5 * * page 6, line 16 - line 20 * * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 4 * * page 11, line 25 - line 32 * * page 12, line 18 - page 14, line 21 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US3988420 (LOEWY DALITH, et al); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 26, Database accession no. 1996-257951, XP002295876 & RU2046757 C1 19951027 (KIROVO CHEPETS CHEM COMBINE) [A] 1,11-13 * abstract * |