EP1733400 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PRESSURE VESSEL OF A PRESSURIZED-WATER REACTOR OF A NUCLEAR POWER STATION A PRESSURE VESSEL OF A PRESSURIZED-WATER REACTOR OF A NUCLEAR POWER STATION AND USE OF A MULTIWALLED PRESSURE VESSEL FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUOMALA, Sulo Maunulantie 19 B 37 00630 Helsinki / FI | For all designated states PITKÄNEN, Ilkka Mikkeläntie 7 B 02770 Espoo / FI | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Laitinen, Pauli Sakari Patentti-Laitinen Oy P.O. Box 29 02771 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Laitinen, Pauli Sakari Patentti-Laitinen Oy, P.O. Box 29 02771 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 04805206.2 | 31.12.2004 | [2006/51] | WO2004FI00811 | Priority number, date | FI20040000387 | 11.03.2004 Original published format: FI 20040387 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005088648 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1733400 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G21C9/00, G21C3/00, B01J3/04 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
G21C13/02 (EP,US);
G21C9/00 (KR);
B01J3/04 (KR);
B01J3/046 (EP,US);
G21C3/00 (KR);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DRUCKBEHÄLTERS EINES DRUCKWASSERREAKTORS EINES KERNKRAFTWERKES, EIN DRUCKBEHÄLTER EINES DRUCKWASSERREAKTORS EINES KERNKRAFTWERKES UND GEBRAUCH EINES MEHRWANDIGEN DRUCKBEHÄLTERS ZUM O.G. ZWECK | [2006/51] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PRESSURE VESSEL OF A PRESSURIZED-WATER REACTOR OF A NUCLEAR POWER STATION A PRESSURE VESSEL OF A PRESSURIZED-WATER REACTOR OF A NUCLEAR POWER STATION AND USE OF A MULTIWALLED PRESSURE VESSEL FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSE | [2006/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE CUVE SOUS PRESSION POUR REACTEUR A EAU PRESSURISEE DE CENTRALE NUCLEAIRE, CUVE SOUS PRESSION ASSOCIEE ET UTILISATION ASSOCIEE D'UNE CUVE SOUS PRESSION MULTIPAROIS | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 09.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 04.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.02.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2007 | 31.12.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2008 | 31.12.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.2009 | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0075072 (GORGENS ERICH); | [X]US4076585 (CACHERA PIERRE CHARLES); | [X]US4666661 (FREDELL JAN [SE], et al); | [A]US3647103 (BERMAN IRWIN); | [A]FR1218206 (BLACKBURN & GENERAL AIRCRAFT L); | [Y]US3469624 (KOPPE ROLF); | [A]US3282459 (WILSON CHARLES D); | [X]US4678626 (GERMER JOHN H [US]) |