EP1692563 - DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC DETECTION OF THE INDEX MARKS OF AN OPHTHALMIC LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 Rue de Paris 94227 Charenton / FR | [2013/26] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL Compagnie Générale d'Optique 147 Rue de Paris 94227 Charenton / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIVO, Fabien, Essilor International 147, rue de Paris F-94227 Charenton / FR | 02 /
LEMAIRE, Cédric, Essilor International 147, rue de Paris F-94227 Charenton / FR | [2013/26] |
Former [2006/34] | 01 /
DIVO, Fabien, Essilor International 147, rue de Paris F-94227 Charenton / FR | ||
02 /
LEMAIRE, Cédric, Essilor International 147, rue de Paris F-94227 Charenton / FR | Representative(s) | Chauvin, Vincent, et al Jacobacci Coralis Harle 14/16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Chauvin, Vincent, et al Coralis 14/16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/34] | Chauvin, Vincent, et al CORALIS Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 22, rue du Général Foy F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04805378.9 | 04.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004FR02827 | Priority number, date | FR20030014462 | 10.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0314462 | [2006/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005066692 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1692563 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692563 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02C13/00 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
G02C13/005 (EP,US);
G02C13/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES [2007/12] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN ERKENNUNG DER INDEXMARKIERUNGEN EINER BRILLENLINSE | [2006/34] | English: | DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC DETECTION OF THE INDEX MARKS OF AN OPHTHALMIC LENS | [2006/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION AUTOMATIQUE DE REPERES D'UNE LENTILLE OPHTALMIQUE | [2013/10] |
Former [2006/34] | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION AUTOMATIQUE DE REPERES D'UNE LENTILLE OPHTALMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 18.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5428448 (ALBERT-GARCIA PABLO [MX]) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 40; claim - *; | [A]US5754272 (DIMALANTA RODRIGO P [US]) [A] 1-18* column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 15; claim - *; | [A]US5855074 (ABITBOL MORDECHAI [IL], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 10, line 9 - column 14 *; | [A]US5973772 (FUKUMA YASUFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * claim - *; | [A]FR2799545 (BRIOT INT [FR]) [A] 1-18 * claim - *; | [A]US2002085196 (FUKUMA YASUFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * column A * * column 1, paragraph 1 - column 3, paragraph 17 * |