EP1701875 - SINGLE-PIECE WEIGHT DESIGNED TO BE HITCHED TO AN AGRICULTURAL TRACTOR LIFTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Defrancq, Hubert 2, rue de Laon 02190 Guignicourt / FR | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Michardière, Bernard Cabinet Armengaud Aîné 3, Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Michardière, Bernard Cabinet Armengaud Aîné 3, Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04805712.9 | 15.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004FR03235 | Priority number, date | FR20040000059 | 06.01.2004 Original published format: FR 0400059 | [2006/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005075283 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1701875 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1701875 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D49/06 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
B62D49/0628 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUM ANHÄNGEN AN EINER HEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN ACKERSCHLEPPER AUSGEFÜHRTES EINSTÜCKIGES GEWICHT | [2006/38] | English: | SINGLE-PIECE WEIGHT DESIGNED TO BE HITCHED TO AN AGRICULTURAL TRACTOR LIFTING DEVICE | [2006/38] | French: | MASSE MONOBLOC D'ALOURDISSEMENT POUR ETRE ACCROCHEE A UN RELEVAGE DE TRACTEUR AGRICOLE | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.01.2008 | CY | 23.01.2008 | CZ | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | IE | 23.01.2008 | LT | 23.01.2008 | RO | 23.01.2008 | SI | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | ES | 04.05.2008 | IS | 23.05.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | HU | 24.07.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/36] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0315595 (SAME SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * figure 2 * * column 2, line 5 - column 2, line 17 *; | [A]DE3801895 (FENDT & CO XAVER [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 13 - column 3, line 21 * * column 3, line 46 - column 3, line 50 *; | [A]US6533319 (DENBY JEFFREY GARY [CA], et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 19 - column 2, line 29 * | Examination | JPH10297890 |