EP1673256 - MOTOR VEHICLE SEATBACK ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2013/04] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIMORT, Isabelle 22 , place Marcel GUILLON F-78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
BENDJELLAL, Farid 6, boulevard de l'hopital Stell F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/26] | 01 /
PIMORT, Isabelle 6, rue Henri Cochet F-78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | ||
02 /
BENDJELLAL, Farid 6, boulevard de l'hopital Stell F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard, et al Bureau D.A. Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Dossmann, Gérard, et al Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Lelkes, Robert Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04805734.3 | 07.10.2004 | [2006/26] | WO2004FR50491 | Priority number, date | FR20030011723 | 07.10.2003 Original published format: FR 0311723 | [2006/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005032880 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1673256 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1673256 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/64, B60N2/48 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
B60N2/643 (EP);
A47C7/38 (KR);
B60N2/80 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/26] | B60N2/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Title | German: | SITZLEHNENANORDNUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2006/26] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE SEATBACK ASSEMBLY | [2006/26] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE DOSSIER DE SIEGE POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2006/26] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2004 | AT | 23.01.2013 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | IT | 23.01.2013 | MC | 23.01.2013 | NL | 23.01.2013 | PL | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | ES | 04.05.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | GB | 07.10.2013 | IE | 07.10.2013 | LU | 07.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
GB | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
GB | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
GB | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 23.01.2013 | |
BG | 23.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6088640 (BREED DAVID S [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE3843616 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]DE10215137 (JOHNSON CONTROLS GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE19800078 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]DE19910666 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]DE2652808 (DOELLING KG A & M); | [A]DE9312512U (BALDERING BERTOLD [DE]); | [A]EP0359962 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP1029736 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]EP1270316 (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2002043860 (DINKEL EMIL [DE], et al); | [A]US2003057748 (SCHAFER VOLKER [DE], et al); | [A]US5826937 (MASSARA ANDREW J [SE]); | [A]US2003001413 (ALBRECHT DONALD [US]); | [A]US6213548 (VAN WYNSBERGHE ROY D [US], et al); | [A]US6022074 (SWEDENKLEF BO [SE]); | [AD]EP0865960 (GIRSBERGER HOLDING AG [CH]); | [AD]DE19923909 (GRAMMER AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]); | [AD]DE3900495 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) | Examination | DE10062511 | GB2012570 | FR2414415 | US5580124 | by applicant | DE19923909 | EP0865960 |