EP1677914 - METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING DROPS OF A LIQUID OF INTEREST ON A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states BIOMERIEUX SA Chemin de l'Orme 69280 Marcy l'Etoile / FR | [2006/44] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, Rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris 15ème / FR | ||
For all designated states BIOMERIEUX SA Chemin de l'Orme 69280 Marcy l'Etoile / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELATTRE, Cyril 33, avenue Jeanne d'Arc F-38100 GRENOBLE / FR | 02 /
MARCHAND, Gilles Putteville F-38119 PIERRE CHATEL / FR | 03 /
POUTEAU, Patrick 10, allée Château Corbeau F-38240 MEYLAN / FR | 04 /
GINOT, Frédéric 32, rue Casimir Brenier F-38120 SAINT EGREVE / FR | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/28] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04805770.7 | 21.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004FR50527 | Priority number, date | FR20030050763 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: FR 0350763 | [2006/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005042164 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1677914 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1677914 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01J19/00 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
B01L3/5088 (EP,US);
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00317 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00653 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00677 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00722 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00725 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00743 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0642 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0636 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0877 (EP,US);
B01L2300/089 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,US);
C40B40/06 (EP,US);
C40B40/10 (EP,US);
C40B50/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERTEILUNG VON TROPFEN EINER BETREFFENDEN FLÜSSIGKEIT AUF EINER FLÄCHE | [2006/28] | English: | METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING DROPS OF A LIQUID OF INTEREST ON A SURFACE | [2006/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE REPARTITION DE GOUTTES D UN LIQUIDE D INTERET SUR UNE SURFACE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 01.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2007 | CY | 05.12.2007 | CZ | 05.12.2007 | DK | 05.12.2007 | EE | 05.12.2007 | FI | 05.12.2007 | IE | 05.12.2007 | NL | 05.12.2007 | PL | 05.12.2007 | RO | 05.12.2007 | SI | 05.12.2007 | SK | 05.12.2007 | TR | 05.12.2007 | BG | 05.03.2008 | SE | 05.03.2008 | GR | 06.03.2008 | PT | 05.05.2008 | HU | 06.06.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/36] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CY | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
HU | 06.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CY | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 05.12.2007 | |
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 05.12.2007 | |
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6143496 (BROWN JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]US6210894 (BRENNAN THOMAS M [US]) [X] 1-30 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 10; figures 3,5 *; | [A]WO0241992 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 6, line 11 - page 10, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6565813 (GARYANTES TINA [US]) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [A]WO03059518 (UNIV COLLEGE CORK NAT UNIV IE [IE], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 30; figures 1,2 * |