EP1719365 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING A TFCI RELIABILITY CHECK IN E-DCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2007/28] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTINELLI, Massimo Merimiehenkatu 14A 10, 00150 FIN-00150 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
MALKAMÄKI, Esa Riippakoivuntie 17B FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Spreepalais am Dom Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/45] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04806410.9 | 21.12.2004 | [2006/45] | WO2004IB04231 | Priority number, date | US20040782381 | 18.02.2004 Original published format: US 782381 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005084113 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1719365 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30, H04L27/00, H04B15/00 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
H04L1/0061 (EP,US);
H04L1/0072 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER TFCI-ZUVERLÄSSIGKEITSPRÜFUNG IN E-DCH | [2006/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING A TFCI RELIABILITY CHECK IN E-DCH | [2006/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR EFFECTUER UN CONTROLE DE LA FIABILITE D'UN TFCI DANS UN CANAL A DONNEES AMELIOREES | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 02.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5742640 (HAOUI AMINE [US], et al); | [A]US7016430 (GRIVNA EDWARD L [US], et al); | [P]US7027518 (MIKKOLA HANNU J [FI], et al) |