EP1773673 - RE-CLOSABLE FLEXIBLE PACKAGE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chaturvedi, Ashok 118-119, Damji Shamji Udyog Bhawan, 1st Floor, 25A Veera Desai Rd, Andheri (W) Mumbai 400 053, Maharashtra / IN | [2007/18] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Chaturvedi, Ashok 118-119, Dhamji Shamji Udyog Bhawan, 1st Floor, 25A Veera Desai Rd, Andheri (W) Mumbai 400 053, Maharashtra / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel UDAPI & Asociados Explanada 8 28040 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel UDAPI & Asociados Patents y Marcas Explanada, 8 E-28040 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 04806729.2 | 05.07.2004 | [2007/16] | WO2004IN00199 | Priority number, date | INMU05822004 | 21.05.2004 Original published format: IN MU05822004 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005113357 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1773673 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/10, B65D33/25, B65D33/34, B31B37/00, B31B29/00 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
B65D31/10 (EP,US);
B65D33/105 (EP,US);
B65D33/2508 (EP,US);
B65D33/2516 (EP,US);
B31B2150/00 (EP,US);
B31B2150/0014 (EP,US);
B31B2150/002 (EP,US);
B31B2155/00 (EP,US);
B31B2155/002 (EP,US);
B31B2160/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARE, FLEXIBLE VERPACKUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/16] | English: | RE-CLOSABLE FLEXIBLE PACKAGE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2007/16] | French: | EMBALLAGE FLEXIBLE REFERMABLE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 18.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003188514 (BOIS HENRI GEORGES [FR]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0070]; figures 3,4,12; claims 1,2,5,6,11,12,14,16,18,21,22,25,26 *; | [Y]US6257763 (STOLMEIER ROBERT C [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 39 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 19; figures 1,8-9A; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]DE29702222U (HEINRICH GREVE GMBH & CO KG MA [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * page 3, line 6 - line 14; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US2002103067 (BOIS HENRI GEORGES [FR]) [A] 1,4 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1,2,8,9; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2003185467 (BUCHANAN JERRY E [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * paragraphs [0060] , [0067] , [0074] , [0075] , [0087] , [0088]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6425847 (BROENSTRUP VOLKER [DE]) [A] 4 * figure 8; claim 1 *; | [A]GB859160 (PLASTUS SA) [A] 4 * page 2, line 88 - line 122 * * page 3, line 15 - line 55; figures 1-3,7; claims 1,3,4 * | by applicant | US5435864 | US5425825 | US2002021499 | IN206245 | IN197705 | EP0524487 | US6533711 | US6053635 | US6481183 |