EP1703665 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION METHOD, NETWORK LOAD PREDICTION NODE, AND NETWORK CONFIGURATION MANAGEMENT NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKINAGA, Yoshikazu., c/o IP Dep. NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
ISHII, Kenji., c/o IP.Dep. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
KANEDA, Shigeru., c/o IP.Dep. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04807197.1 | 16.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004JP18839 | Priority number, date | JP20030418528 | 16.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003418528 | [2006/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005060161 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703665 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04B7/26, H04L12/28 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
H04L41/00 (EP,US);
H04L41/147 (US);
H04L41/142 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W72/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/38] | H04L12/24, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/13] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, NETZWERKLASTVORHERSAGEKNOTEN UND NETZWERKKONFIGURATIONS-VERWALTUNGSKNOTEN | [2006/38] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION METHOD, NETWORK LOAD PREDICTION NODE, AND NETWORK CONFIGURATION MANAGEMENT NODE | [2006/38] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LES COMMUNICATIONS, NOEUD DE PREVISION DE CHARGE DE RESEAU, ET NOEUD DE GESTION DE CONFIGURATION DE RESEAU | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2006 | Translation filed | 17.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0007384 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 3 * * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 9 * * page 5, line 7 - line 23; figures 1,5,6 *; | [X]WO0229427 (ZVOLVE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 16 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 23 * * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 19 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 4 * * page 14, line 21 - page 16, line 6 * * page 18, line 17 - page 19, line 15 *; | [X]US6385454 (BAHL PARAMVIR [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 60 * * column 5, line 25 - line 49 * * column 11, line 1 - line 22 ** column 18, line 5 - line 19; claims 15,16 *; | [X]JP2003037553 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0018] - [0027] * | International search | [Y]JPH09121223 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2003037553 (NEC CORP) |