EP1703284 - METHOD OF RAISING TEMPERATURE OF RECEIVED OBJECT, AND ANALYZING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | ||
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Arkray, Inc. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURATA, Yasuhito Arkray Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6018045 / JP | 02 /
OKA, Junichi Arkray Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6018045 / JP | [2012/21] |
Former [2006/38] | 01 /
MURATA, Yasuhito Arkray Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6018045 / JP | ||
02 /
OKA, Junichi Arkray Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6018045 / JP | Representative(s) | Jones, Elizabeth Louise, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Jones, Elizabeth Louise, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/38] | Pluckrose, Anthony William BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04807737.4 | 24.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004JP19380 | Priority number, date | JP20030429040 | 25.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003429040 | [2006/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005064348 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703284 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1703284 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
G01N21/0332 (EP,US);
B01L7/00 (EP,US);
B01L2200/147 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1805 (EP,US);
B01L3/5082 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00356 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER TEMPERATUR EINES ERHALTENEN OBJEKTS UND ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG | [2006/38] | English: | METHOD OF RAISING TEMPERATURE OF RECEIVED OBJECT, AND ANALYZING DEVICE | [2006/38] | French: | PROCEDE POUR AUGMENTER LA TEMPERATURE D'UN OBJET RECU, ET DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2006 | Translation filed | 21.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.12.2004 | AT | 23.05.2012 | BE | 23.05.2012 | CY | 23.05.2012 | CZ | 23.05.2012 | DK | 23.05.2012 | EE | 23.05.2012 | FI | 23.05.2012 | LT | 23.05.2012 | NL | 23.05.2012 | PL | 23.05.2012 | RO | 23.05.2012 | SE | 23.05.2012 | SI | 23.05.2012 | SK | 23.05.2012 | TR | 23.05.2012 | BG | 23.08.2012 | GR | 24.08.2012 | ES | 03.09.2012 | IS | 23.09.2012 | PT | 24.09.2012 | IE | 24.12.2012 | LU | 24.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
IE | 24.12.2012 | ||
LU | 24.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
IE | 24.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
IE | 24.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
IE | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 23.05.2012 | |
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 23.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4679615 (LIVNE AVINOAM [IL]) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [A]US5410130 (BRAUNSTEIN ZACHARY L [US]) [A] 1-23 * claims 10-13 *; | [A]WO9623249 (MARSHALL BIOTECH LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH07167865 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | [Y]JPH0614968U (NITTEC CO., LTD); | [Y]JPH1183802 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH09189703 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) | by applicant | JPH09189703 | JPH09304269 | JP2001318101 |