EP1695275 - BANK TRANSACTION METHOD LINKING ACCOUNTS VIA COMMON ACCOUNTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huh, Inghoo 3-113 Bukgajwa-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-810 / KR | [2009/46] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Huh, Inghoo 3-113 Bukgajwa-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-810 / KR | ||
For all designated states Teachiworld Co. Ltd. 302, 35-3 Yoido-dong Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-704 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUH, Inghoo 3-113, Bukgajwa-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-810 / KR | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04808383.6 | 10.12.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004KR03252 | Priority number, date | KR20030092845 | 18.12.2003 Original published format: KR 2003092845 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005059795 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1695275 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07F19/00 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
G06Q20/10 (EP,KR,US);
G07F19/00 (US);
G06Q20/108 (EP);
G06Q20/227 (EP,US);
G06Q20/405 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/35] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/13] |
Former [2006/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BANKTRANSAKTIONSSYSTEM, DAS KONTEN ÜBER GEMEINSAME KONTEN VERKNÜPFT | [2006/35] | English: | BANK TRANSACTION METHOD LINKING ACCOUNTS VIA COMMON ACCOUNTS | [2006/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSACTION BANCAIRE ASSOCIANT DES COMPTES VIA DES COMPTES COMMUNS | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 20.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/01] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.01.2007 | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2010 | 31.12.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0658862 (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 1 *; | [Y]US5826243 (MUSMANNO THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 28 *; | [A]US5864830 (ARMETTA DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5984180 (ALBRECHT JERRY L [US]); | [A]US6021943 (CHASTAIN ROBERT H [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003080185 (WERTHER ELLEN R [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0038] *; | [A]US2003080186 (MCDONALD IAN [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5914472 (FOLADARE MARK JEFFREY [US], et al); | [A]KR20020031531 (CHA MYUNG GIL [KR]); | [Y]KR20020097303 (BIZMODELINE CO LTD [KR]) |