EP1703786 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOVING PLANT PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agrarisch Loonbedrijf C. PelliKaan Limbraweg 51 5424 SC Elsendorp / NL | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLIKAAN, Cornelis 51, Limbraweg NL-5424 SC Elsendorp / NL | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Mertens, Hans Victor Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) J.J. Viottastraat 31 1071 JP Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Mertens, Hans Victor Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 04808764.7 | 06.12.2004 | [2006/39] | WO2004NL00848 | Priority number, date | NL20031024960 | 05.12.2003 Original published format: NL 1024960 | [2006/39] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005058013 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703786 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01G3/00 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
A01D45/006 (EP);
A01G3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON PFLANZENTEILEN | [2006/39] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOVING PLANT PARTS | [2006/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SEPARATION DE PARTIES DE PLANTES | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0407322 (RAFFAELLO, HENRI) [X] 1-6,8,10-13,18,23-27,30,31,33-40 * the whole document *; | [X]US4781228 (VADERS ET AL) [X] 1-6,8,18,23-27,33-37 * the whole document *; | [X]US4416311 (GEMMELL-MURDOCH ET AL) [X] 1-6,8,10-14,18,23,25-28 * the whole document *; | [XY]FR1331062 (DAYOT, LOUIS) [X] 1-5,11,12,18,23-26 * the whole document * [Y] 21,22; | [AY]NL1017406C (AGRARISCH LOONBEDRIJF C. PELLIKAAN) [A] 1-48 * the whole document * [Y] 21,22; | [X]US5261163 (SHEARHART ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,17,23 * the whole document *; | [A]US5956897 (TAKASHIMA ET AL) [A] 1-48 * figures 1-3; claims 5-7 * |